Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. PXI Hospitality Group Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., PWMP Acquisition I LLC, Crompton Songs, Gibb Brothers Music, Hot-Cha Music Co., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Richard Hall Music, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. and Unichappell Music Inc.
Defendant: PXI Hospitality Group Inc., Philip Iordanou and George Iordanou
Case Number: 2:2019cv04045
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Referring Judge: Robert M Levy
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 9/19/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 11B South before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 8/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 IC Questionnaire, #2 Individual Rules) (Marino, Janine)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to All Defendants. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 8/8/2019. (Marino, Janine)
August 7, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by George Iordanou, Philip Iordanou, PXI Hospitality Group Inc.. (Sjoquist, Chad)
August 2, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Unichappell Music Inc., Gibb Brothers Music, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Hot-Cha Music Co., Crompton Songs, Broadcast Music, Inc., PWMP Acquisition I LLC, Richard Hall Music, Inc.. George Iordanou served on 7/30/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Lower, Jonathon)
August 2, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Unichappell Music Inc., Gibb Brothers Music, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Hot-Cha Music Co., Crompton Songs, Broadcast Music, Inc., PWMP Acquisition I LLC, Richard Hall Music, Inc.. Philip Iordanou served on 7/30/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Lower, Jonathon)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Unichappell Music Inc., Gibb Brothers Music, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Hot-Cha Music Co., Crompton Songs, Broadcast Music, Inc., PWMP Acquisition I LLC, Richard Hall Music, Inc.. PXI Hospitality Group Inc. served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (Sidoti, Mark)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Attachments: #1 complaint) (Rocco, Christine)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to George Iordanou, Philip Iordanou, PXI Hospitality Group Inc.. (Doudalis, Evelyn)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Doudalis, Evelyn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/15/2019: #2 Complaint) (Doudalis, Evelyn).
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Doudalis, Evelyn)
July 15, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Doudalis, Evelyn)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Doudalis, Evelyn)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathon Brugh Lower on behalf of Broadcast Music, Inc., Crompton Songs, Gibb Brothers Music, Hot-Cha Music Co., PWMP Acquisition I LLC, Richard Hall Music, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Unichappell Music Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. (aty to be noticed) (Lower, Jonathon)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music, Inc., Crompton Songs, Gibb Brothers Music, Hot-Cha Music Co., PWMP Acquisition I LLC, Richard Hall Music, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Unichappell Music Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Warner Music Group Corp. for Unichappell Music Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.; Corporate Parent Primary Wave Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Management, LLC, Corporate Parent Plainfield Specialty Holdings, Inc. for PWMP Acquisition I LLC; Corporate Parent TEGNA, Inc. for Broadcast Music, Inc.; Corporate Parent Sony Music Entertainment, Inc. for Sony/ATV Songs LLC. (Sidoti, Mark)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against George Iordanou, Philip Iordanou, PXI Hospitality Group Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11658965 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes, filed by Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Unichappell Music Inc., Gibb Brothers Music, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Hot-Cha Music Co., Crompton Songs, Broadcast Music, Inc., PWMP Acquisition I LLC, Richard Hall Music, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons (PXI Hospitality Group Inc.), #3 Proposed Summons (Philip Iordanou), #4 Proposed Summons (George Iordanou)) (Sidoti, Mark) Modified on 7/15/2019 (Doudalis, Evelyn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. PXI Hospitality Group Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Mark S. Sidoti
Represented By: Jonathon Brugh Lower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PWMP Acquisition I LLC
Represented By: Mark S. Sidoti
Represented By: Jonathon Brugh Lower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crompton Songs
Represented By: Mark S. Sidoti
Represented By: Jonathon Brugh Lower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gibb Brothers Music
Represented By: Mark S. Sidoti
Represented By: Jonathon Brugh Lower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hot-Cha Music Co.
Represented By: Mark S. Sidoti
Represented By: Jonathon Brugh Lower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Represented By: Mark S. Sidoti
Represented By: Jonathon Brugh Lower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Hall Music, Inc.
Represented By: Mark S. Sidoti
Represented By: Jonathon Brugh Lower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.
Represented By: Mark S. Sidoti
Represented By: Jonathon Brugh Lower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unichappell Music Inc.
Represented By: Mark S. Sidoti
Represented By: Jonathon Brugh Lower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PXI Hospitality Group Inc.
Represented By: Chad Everette Sjoquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Iordanou
Represented By: Chad Everette Sjoquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Iordanou
Represented By: Chad Everette Sjoquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?