Windward Bora LLC v. Zinnar et al
Plaintiff: Windward Bora LLC
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, NA, Osnat Zinnar, Osnat Zinnar, Trustee of the Osnat Zinnar Trust, Oil Services, Inc. and Asaf Zinnar
Case Number: 2:2019cv04533
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Robert M Levy
Referring Judge: Roslynn R Mauskopf
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12:191
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Osnat Zinnar. (Almonte, Giselle)
August 30, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Windward Bora LLC. Oil Services, Inc. served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019. (Weinreb, Alan)
August 21, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Windward Bora LLC. Osnat Zinnar, Trustee of the Osnat Zinnar Trust served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Weinreb, Alan)
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Windward Bora LLC. Osnat Zinnar served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Weinreb, Alan)
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Windward Bora LLC. Asaf Zinnar served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Weinreb, Alan)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Windward Bora LLC. JP Morgan Chase Bank, NA served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/2/2019. (Weinreb, Alan)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 7, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION Certificate of Merit Affirmation Pursuant to CPLR 3012-b by Windward Bora LLC (Weinreb, Alan)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. by Windward Bora LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Weinreb, Alan)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Windward Bora LLC (Weinreb, Alan)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JP Morgan Chase Bank, NA, Oil Services, Inc., Asaf Zinnar, Osnat Zinnar, Osnat Zinnar, Trustee of the Osnat Zinnar Trust filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11736220 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Windward Bora LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through Exhibit F, #2 N.Y. RPAPL 1320 Notice) (Weinreb, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Windward Bora LLC v. Zinnar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osnat Zinnar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osnat Zinnar, Trustee of the Osnat Zinnar Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oil Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asaf Zinnar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Windward Bora LLC
Represented By: Alan H Weinreb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?