Palm Avenue Hialeah Trust v. Cuce et al
Plaintiff: Palm Avenue Hialeah Trust, a Delaware Statutory Trust, for and on behalf and solely with respect to Palm Avenue Hialeah Trust Series, 2014-1 and Palm Avenue Hialeah Trust
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, First United Mortgage Banking Corp and Salvatore Cuce
Case Number: 2:2019cv04580
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nicholas G Garaufis
Referring Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12:191
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Certificate of Default by Palm Avenue Hialeah Trust (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Eisenberg, Ross)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Palm Avenue Hialeah Trust. First United Mortgage Banking Corp served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. (Eisenberg, Ross)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Palm Avenue Hialeah Trust. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Eisenberg, Ross)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Palm Avenue Hialeah Trust. Salvatore Cuce served on 9/4/2019, answer due 9/25/2019. (Eisenberg, Ross)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Salvatore Cuce, First United Mortgage Banking Corp, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 14, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 14, 2019 Incorrect Document Entry Information. Due to technical difficulties while opening the case, initiating documents were e-mailed to and filed by the Clerk's Office staff. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 14, 2019 FILING FEE: $400, receipt number ANYEDC-11760402 (Rodin, Deanna)
August 9, 2019 The case of Palm Avenue Hialeah Trust v. Cuce et al, has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. The case number is 19cv4580. PLEASE NOTE: You must pay the case filing fee within seven (7) days. Select the event (Civil Case Filing Fee) and pay online. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Palm Avenue Hialeah Trust identifying Corporate Parent David Gordon, Corporate Parent John Olson, Corporate Parent Palm Avenue Hialeah LLC for Palm Avenue Hialeah Trust. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Palm Avenue Hialeah Trust. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Merit, #3 Proposed Summons) (Rodin, Deanna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palm Avenue Hialeah Trust v. Cuce et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Palm Avenue Hialeah Trust, a Delaware Statutory Trust, for and on behalf and solely with respect to Palm Avenue Hialeah Trust Series, 2014-1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Palm Avenue Hialeah Trust
Represented By: Ross Eisenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First United Mortgage Banking Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salvatore Cuce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?