Carle Place Water District v. The 3M Company et. al.
Plaintiff: Carle Place Water District
Defendant: The 3M Company, E.I. Dupont De Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company and Dyneon LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv04611
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denis R Hurley
Referring Judge: A Kathleen Tomlinson
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carle Place Water District. E.I. Dupont De Nemours and Company served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019. (Edling, Matthew)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carle Place Water District. The Chemours Company served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019. (Edling, Matthew)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Carle Place Water District. The 3M Company waiver sent on 9/6/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. (Edling, Matthew)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for November 5, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson in Courtroom 910 at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York. No later than two business days before the Initial Conference, counsel for the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the court's ECF system, a Joint Proposed Discovery Plan. SEE ATTACHED ORDER for additional details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 9/9/2019. (Cento, Patrick)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons-Dyneon LLC, #2 Summons-E.I. Dupont De Nemours and Company, #3 Summons-The Chemours Company) (Flanagan, Doreen)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
August 12, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dyneon LLC, E.I. Dupont De Nemours and Company, The 3M Company, The Chemours Company filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11749474 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Carle Place Water District. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons) (Edling, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carle Place Water District v. The 3M Company et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. Dupont De Nemours and Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dyneon LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carle Place Water District
Represented By: Matthew K Edling
Represented By: Peter M. Fishbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?