Freedom Mortgage Corporation v. Paccione et. al.
Plaintiff: Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Defendant: Karen Paccione, Long Island Emergency Care PC and Luis E. Cardona
Case Number: 2:2019cv04773
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Referring Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Hearing served on Defendants on October 18, 2019, filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Vargas, Stephen)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 11:30 AM on 1/17/2020 before Magistrate Judge Bulsara in Courtroom 324N. All counsel must attend. Plaintiff is directed to notify Defendant of this scheduling order at the time Defendant makes an appearance with in this matter. Counsel are also directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than two days before 1/17/2020. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the discovery worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 9/18/2019. (Manson, Eddie)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. Long Island Emergency Care PC served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (Bebirian, Nicholas)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. Luis E. Cardona served on 8/31/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Bebirian, Nicholas)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. Karen Paccione served on 8/31/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Bebirian, Nicholas)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Freedom Mortgage Corporation (Bebirian, Nicholas)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Luis E. Cardona, Long Island Emergency Care PC, Karen Paccione. (Flanagan, Doreen)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
August 20, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Freedom Mortgage Corporation (Bebirian, Nicholas)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Luis E. Cardona, Long Island Emergency Care PC, Karen Paccione filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11774930 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons for all Defendants, #3 Certificate of Merit pursuant to 3012-b) (Bebirian, Nicholas) Modified on 8/20/2019 (Flanagan, Doreen).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freedom Mortgage Corporation v. Paccione et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Paccione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Island Emergency Care PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis E. Cardona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Nicholas John Bebirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?