Wilson et. al. v. The United States
Plaintiff: Estate of Joseph A. Wilson, Emily S. Wilson and the Estate of Joseph A. Wilson
Defendant: United States of America and The United States
Case Number: 2:2019cv05037
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 18 Amended MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (cross-motion) by Emily S. Wilson, the Estate of Joseph A. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Rule 56.1 Statement) (Cohen, Michael)
October 28, 2019 Filing 17 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Emily S. Wilson, the Estate of Joseph A. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Declaration Robert M. Adler, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Adler, Robert)
October 24, 2019 Minute Entry and Order for joint Initial Status Conference and Oral Argument on the Government's partial motion to dismiss held on 10/24/2019 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. Counsel for both sides appeared by telephone. Plaintiffs orally cross-moved for partial summary judgment and judgment on the pleadings. The Court grants #16 Government's motion for leave to file a reply in support, which reply was filed concurrently with the motion. Decision reserved. See transcript for details. (Court Reporter: Anthony Frisolone.) (Weisberg, Peggy)
October 23, 2019 Set/Reset Hearing: Oral Argument and Initial Status Conference previously set at 2:30 pm on 10/24/2019 is reset to 10:00 am and will be held by telephone. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to arrange and initiate the conference call and the parties will jointly call Chambers at 718-613-2230. (Weisberg, Peggy)
October 22, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File Document reply in support of partial motion to dismiss (with proposed reply) by The United States. (Murphy, Edward)
October 21, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference, Plaintiff's Opposition to the Government's Motion for Partial Dismissal of the Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. (Adler, Robert)
October 18, 2019 Filing 14 Letter Judge Cogan re Joint Letter with description of the case, including factal, jurisdictional, and legal basis for the claims and defenses by Emily S. Wilson, the Estate of Joseph A. Wilson (Adler, Robert)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER re: #13 . The Initial Status Conference will follow argument on the motion. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/15/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
October 14, 2019 Filing 13 Letter re Question of date of Initial Status Conference and Oral Argument by Emily S. Wilson, the Estate of Joseph A. Wilson (Adler, Robert)
October 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Thelma A Lizama on behalf of The United States (aty to be noticed) (Lizama, Thelma)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER denying as moot #11 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. The premotion conference is waived. This motion is deemed to constitute the Government's motion to partially dismiss the complaint. Plaintiff shall file opposition to the motion by 10/21/19 and oral argument on the motion will be held on 10/24/19 at 2:30 p.m. in courtroom 8D. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/9/2019. (Cogan, Brian)
October 9, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for pre motion conference re #1 Complaint, partial motion to dismiss by The United States. (Murphy, Edward)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER re: #10 Letter Request to Reschedule Initial Status Conference. Request is granted. Initial Status Conference adjourned to 10/24/2019 at 2:30 pm in Chambers 704S. Parties are reminded to comply with the mandatory requirements for the conference set forth at #7 . In addition, since this letter seeks relief from the Court, it should have been designated as an ECF event Letter "Motion". Do not refile the letter. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/23/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 Letter re Request to Reschedule Initial Status Conference by Emily S. Wilson, the Estate of Joseph A. Wilson (Adler, Robert)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Adler on behalf of All Plaintiffs (notification declined or already on case) (Adler, Robert)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Robert Adler's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for plaintiffs. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/18/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11855150. by Emily S. Wilson, the Estate of Joseph A. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Adler, Robert)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 10/21/2019 at 11:30 AM in Chambers 704S. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/6/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to The United States, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Guzzi, Roseann)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Emily S. Wilson, the Estate of Joseph A. Wilson (Cohen, Michael)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
September 5, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
September 5, 2019 Incorrect Case/Document Entry Information. Deleted Document Entry No. 2 (Civil Cover Sheet), filed as Case Management Statement, and re-entered utilizing the correct event, Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Flanagan, Doreen)
September 5, 2019 Incorrect Case/Document Entry Information. Deleted Defendant United States of America and added Defendant The United States to conform to the Complaint. Deleted Document Entry No. 1 (Complaint and Exhibits A-H) and re-entered as against Defendant. (Flanagan, Doreen)
September 4, 2019 FILING FEE: $ 400.00, receipt number ANYEDC-11817210 (Flanagan, Doreen)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Emily S. Wilson, the Estate of Joseph A. Wilson. (Flanagan, Doreen)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Emily S. Wilson, the Estate of Joseph A. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H) (Flanagan, Doreen) Modified on 9/5/2019 (Flanagan, Doreen).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson et. al. v. The United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Joseph A. Wilson
Represented By: Michael Jason Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily S. Wilson
Represented By: Michael Jason Cohen
Represented By: Robert Adler
Represented By: Gary Steven Redish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: the Estate of Joseph A. Wilson
Represented By: Robert Adler
Represented By: Gary Steven Redish
Represented By: Michael Jason Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States
Represented By: Thelma A Lizama
Represented By: Edward J. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?