Nutter v. Long Island Rail Road Company
Plaintiff: Steven Nutter
Defendant: Long Island Rail Road Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv05350
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nicholas G Garaufis
Referring Judge: Ramon E Reyes
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 10 Proposed Scheduling Order of the Parties by Steven Nutter (Lauriello, Valerie)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 Motion to Adjourn 11/6/2019 Conference. Initial Conference rescheduled for 11/20/2019 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 10/24/2019. (Vertus, Miriam)
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference (Initial) by Long Island Rail Road Company. (McCaffrey, Kevin)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 11/6/2019 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr., located in the United States Eastern District of New York Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York 11201. All counsel are required to attend, and plaintiff's counsel is directed to ensure that all counsel are aware of their obligation to appear. Any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference. Prior to the conference, the parties are to comply with the requirements of Rule 26(f) of the Fed. R. Civ. P. (See attached blank document) Case Management Statement must be completed and filed on ECF no later than 11/1/2019. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 10/21/2019. (Vertus, Miriam)
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Long Island Rail Road Company. (McCaffrey, Kevin)
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Long Island Rail Road Company identifying Corporate Parent MTA, Other Affiliate MTA Bridges and Tunnels, Other Affiliate MTA New York City Transit, Other Affiliate MTA Metro-North Commuter Railroad, Other Affiliate MTA Capital Construction, Other Affiliate MTA Bus Company and MTA Staten Island Railway for Long Island Rail Road Company. (McCaffrey, Kevin)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven Nutter. Long Island Rail Road Company served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019. (Lauriello, Valerie)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Long Island Rail Road Company. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
September 19, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Long Island Rail Road Company filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11865226 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No, filed by Steven Nutter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Lauriello, Valerie) Modified on 9/20/2019 (Vanderbilt, Evelyn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nutter v. Long Island Rail Road Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Nutter
Represented By: Valerie J. Lauriello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Island Rail Road Company
Represented By: Kevin Patrick McCaffrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?