Snyder v. Long Island Rail Road Company
Plaintiff: John Snyder
Defendant: Long Island Rail Road Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv05384
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Peggy Kuo
Referring Judge: Roslynn R Mauskopf
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Initial Conference held via telephone on November 18, 2019. Attorney Valerie J. Lauriello appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. Attorney J. Dennis McGrath appeared on behalf of Defendant. The attached Scheduling Order was entered setting deadlines for discovery and other pretrial proceedings. The parties were directed to file a joint status report by March 20, 2020 reporting on the progress of discovery and raising any issues which need to be addressed. If the parties believe a settlement conference would be fruitful, they should file a joint request. (FTR Log #10:35-10:42.) (Prentice, Amanda)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear by Telephone. The in person initial conference set for Monday November 18, 2019 is converted to a telephone conference. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call, with Defendant's counsel on the line, by calling Chambers at 718-613-2400. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 11/15/2019. (Riquelme, Claudia)
November 15, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear by Telephone by John Snyder. (Lauriello, Valerie)
November 15, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Scheduling Order of the Parties by John Snyder (Lauriello, Valerie)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference will be held in this case on November 18, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge, in Courtroom 11C South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. All counsel are required to attend. Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. At least five days before the Conference, the parties must file a completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/pub/PK-discovplan.pdf. Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 10/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Discovery Plan) (Riquelme, Claudia)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Long Island Rail Road Company. (McGrath, J.)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Long Island Rail Road Company identifying Corporate Parent Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Other Affiliate MTA New York City Transit, Other Affiliate MTA Staten Island Railway, Other Affiliate MTA Capital Construction, Other Affiliate MTA Bus Company, Other Affiliate MTA Bridges and Tunnels, Other Affiliate MTA Metro North Commuter Railroad for Long Island Rail Road Company. (McGrath, J.)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Snyder. Long Island Rail Road Company served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019. (Lauriello, Valerie)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Long Island Rail Road Company. (Rodin, Deanna)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
September 20, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Long Island Rail Road Company filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11869199 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by John Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Lauriello, Valerie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snyder v. Long Island Rail Road Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Snyder
Represented By: Valerie J. Lauriello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Island Rail Road Company
Represented By: J. Dennis McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?