People Of The State Of New York v. Quinn
Plaintiff: People Of The State Of New York
Defendant: Linee Quinn and Chace Quinn
Case Number: 2:2019cv05746
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denis R Hurley
Referring Judge: Anne Y Shields
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by People Of The State Of New York. (DiVincenzo, Grazia)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 2/10/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 830 before Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. See Order and Attachment. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 10/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 AYS Rules) (Torres, Jasmine)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 16, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 16, 2019 Incorrect Document Entry Information. The Notice of Removal was filed on behalf of two defendants on two separate cases; counsel filed a separate case for the second defendant and emailed a revised Notice of Removal to reflect one defendant only. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Linee Quinn from Southampton Town Justice Court, case number 17-120648. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYEDC-11935054) Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Shinnecock Letter, #3 Exhibit Notice and Demand, #4 Exhibit Order to Counsel, #5 Exhibit Notice and Demand, #6 Exhibit Notice of Application, #7 Exhibit Notice of Motion for Bill of Particulars, #8 Exhibit Consolidated Affirmation in Opposition to Defendants Motion, #9 Exhibit Response to Consolidated Affirmation in Opposition to Defendants Motion, #10 Exhibit Decision of Motion, #11 Exhibit Notice and Demand, #12 Exhibit Order to Counsel, #13 Exhibit Linee Quinn Letter, #14 Exhibit Linee Quinn Ticket, #15 Exhibit Notice of Application, #16 Exhibit Notice of Motion for Bill of Particulars, #17 Exhibit Consolidated Affirmation in Opposition to Defendants Motion, #18 Exhibit Response to Consolidated Affirmation in Opposition to Defendants Motion, #19 Exhibit Decision of Motion) (Troge, Tela) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/16/2019) (Rodin, Deanna). Modified on 10/16/2019 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: People Of The State Of New York v. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People Of The State Of New York
Represented By: Timothy D. Sini
Represented By: Grazia R. DiVincenzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linee Quinn
Represented By: Tela L Troge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chace Quinn
Represented By: Tela L Troge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?