The People Of The State Of New York v. Quinn
Plaintiff: People Of The State Of New York and The People of The State of New York
Defendant: Chace Quinn
Case Number: 2:2019cv05828
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denis R Hurley
Referring Judge: Anne Y Shields
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields for all further proceedings. Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto, Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 11/19/2019. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION in response to Court's Order by The People of The State of New York (Attachments: #1 Supplement) (Costello, Thomas)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas C. Costello on behalf of The People of The State of New York (aty to be noticed) (Costello, Thomas)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION by Chace Quinn (Troge, Tela)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Defendant is directed to explain his good cause for leave to file his Notice of Removal #1 pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1455(b), as referenced in paragraph 47, by November 12, 2019. The People of the State of New York shall file its response in opposition, if any, by November 15, 2019. Defendant is directed to serve this Order on counsel for the People of the State of New York and file certification of service on the docket. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 11/4/2019. (Prentice, Amanda)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 16, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Chace Quinn from Southampton Town Justice Court, case number 17-120647. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYEDC-11946120)Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Letter, #3 Exhibit Order to Counsel, #4 Exhibit Notice, #5 Exhibit Notice and Demand, #6 Exhibit Notice of Application, #7 Exhibit Notice of Motion for Bill of Particulars, #8 Exhibit Response to Consolidated Affirmation in Opposition to Defendants Motion, #9 Exhibit Decision on Motion, #10 Exhibit Consolidated Affirmation in Opposition to Defendants Motion) (Troge, Tela) Modified on 10/16/2019 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The People Of The State Of New York v. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People Of The State Of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The People of The State of New York
Represented By: Thomas C. Costello
Represented By: Timothy D. Sini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chace Quinn
Represented By: Tela L Troge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?