Neazer v. Federal National Mortgage Association
Plaintiff: Lori Neazer
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Case Number: 2:2019cv06002
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Steven I Locke
Referring Judge: Joanna Seybert
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Pre-Motion Conference. Pre-Motion Conference set for Tue. 1/14/2020 at 2:00pm in Courtroom 1030 before Judge Joanna Seybert. See attached Notice. Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 12/23/2019. (Baran, Charles)
December 6, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for pre motion conference by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Battista, Joseph)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Related Case indicated on the Civil Cover Sheet in Case No. 2:19-cv-06002. (Flanagan, Doreen)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
October 28, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Notice of Removal by Federal National Mortgage Association (Battista, Joseph)
October 25, 2019 SECOND NOTICE: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet; specifically Page 2 of the Civil Cover Sheet is missing. Please resubmit a corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Flanagan, Doreen)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Notice of Removal by Federal National Mortgage Association (Battista, Joseph)
October 25, 2019 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please submit a Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Flanagan, Doreen)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Federal National Mortgage Association from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Suffolk, Case Number 617987/2019. Was the Disclosure Statement on the Civil Cover Sheet completed - No. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-11979220) (Battista, Joseph) Modified on 10/28/2019 (Flanagan, Doreen).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neazer v. Federal National Mortgage Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Joseph F. Battista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Neazer
Represented By: Joseph P. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?