Wu v. Aero Opco LLC
Plaintiff: Kathy Wu
Defendant: Aero Opco LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv06029
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Referring Judge: Joanna Seybert
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The time for Defendant to answer, move against or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended to and including January 27, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 12/13/2019. (Jacobwitz, Beth)
December 12, 2019 Filing 9 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the Complaint by Aero Opco LLC. (Fleming, Michael)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER re #8 : The Motion of Anne Marie Estevez for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 12/11/2019. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
December 10, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12139714. by Aero Opco LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Anne Marie Estevez, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Estevez, Anne Marie)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Initial Conference ORDER: If counsel cannot agree to the proposed schedule or minor modifications thereof, as attached, they are directed to appear before the undersigned in Courtroom 810, United States Federal Courthouse, Central Islip, New York at the date and time provided in the initial conference order. See attachments for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 11/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order) c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Friel Fleming on behalf of Aero Opco LLC (aty to be noticed) (Fleming, Michael)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Aero Opco LLC. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for additional corrections that were made. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 25, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aero Opco LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11981816 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Kathy Wu. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Solotoff, Darryn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wu v. Aero Opco LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Wu
Represented By: Darryn G Solotoff
Represented By: Darryn G. Solotoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aero Opco LLC
Represented By: Anne Marie Estevez
Represented By: Michael Friel Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?