Cruz et al v. Celestino et al
Plaintiff: Oscar Cruz, Eleanor Soliz and Jose Mancia
Defendant: ABC Corp., Donald Celestino, Ultra Sonic Express, Inc., Ultra Sonic Inc., Ultra Sonic RVC, Inc. and John/Jane Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2019cv06093
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Referring Judge: Dora Lizette Irizarry
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 2:00 PM on 3/06/2020 before Magistrate Judge Bulsara in Courtroom 324N. All counsel must attend. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than two days before 3/06/2020. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the discovery worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 12/13/2019. (Manson, Eddie)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #5 is granted. Defendants Donald Gelestino, Ultra Sonic Express, Inc., Ultra Sonic RVC, Inc., and Ultra Sonic Inc. must answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 1/13/2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 12/11/2019. (Guo, Alicia)
December 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by William H Ng on behalf of Donald Celestino, Ultra Sonic Express, Inc., Ultra Sonic Inc., Ultra Sonic RVC, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Ng, William)
December 10, 2019 Filing 5 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Donald Celestino, Ultra Sonic Express, Inc., Ultra Sonic Inc., Ultra Sonic RVC, Inc.. (Capobianco, Matthew) Modified on 12/11/2019 (Guo, Alicia).
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 30, 2019 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11991689 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Jose Mancia, Eleanor Soliz, Oscar Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Monteiro, Marcus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz et al v. Celestino et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Celestino
Represented By: William H Ng
Represented By: Matthew R. Capobianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ultra Sonic Express, Inc.
Represented By: William H Ng
Represented By: Matthew R. Capobianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ultra Sonic Inc.
Represented By: William H Ng
Represented By: Matthew R. Capobianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ultra Sonic RVC, Inc.
Represented By: William H Ng
Represented By: Matthew R. Capobianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Cruz
Represented By: Marcus Monteiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eleanor Soliz
Represented By: Marcus Monteiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Mancia
Represented By: Marcus Monteiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?