DiResta v. Citibank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Lizette DiResta
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2019cv06304
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Referring Judge: James Orenstein
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (Greene, Donna)
December 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Lizette DiResta With Prejudice (DiResta, Timothy)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File -- The motion is granted and the stipulation is so ordered; Citibank, N.A. shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by December 16, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 11/14/2019. (Gutmann, Joseph)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the Complaint by Citibank, N.A.. (Del Tatto, Gina)
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
November 8, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/8/2019: #1 Additional Corrections) (Rodin, Deanna).
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Citibank, N.A. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Del Tatto, Gina)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Citibank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Citicorp, Other Affiliate Citigroup Inc. for Citibank, N.A.. (Del Tatto, Gina)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Citibank, N.A. from District Court of the County of Nassau, State of New York, First District: Hempstead Civil Part, case number CV-016943-19. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYEDC-12023192) Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Del Tatto, Gina) Modified on 11/8/2019 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DiResta v. Citibank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Represented By: Gina Del Tatto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lizette DiResta
Represented By: Timothy D. DiResta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?