New Son Yeng Produce NY LLC v. Guru Teg Holding Inc. et al
Plaintiff: New Son Yeng Produce NY LLC
Defendant: OM Vegetable Inc., Guru Teg Holding Inc., Amandeep Singh, Krishna Holding Inc., Sunil Patel and A&S Vegetable Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv06410
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by New Son Yeng Produce NY LLC. Sunil Patel served on 12/4/2019, answer due 12/25/2019. (Kreinces, Leonard)
December 4, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by New Son Yeng Produce NY LLC. OM Vegetable Inc. served on 11/29/2019, answer due 12/20/2019. (Kreinces, Leonard)
December 4, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by New Son Yeng Produce NY LLC. A&S Vegetable Inc. served on 11/29/2019, answer due 12/20/2019. (Kreinces, Leonard)
December 4, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by New Son Yeng Produce NY LLC. Krishna Holding Inc. served on 11/29/2019, answer due 12/20/2019. (Kreinces, Leonard)
December 4, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by New Son Yeng Produce NY LLC. Guru Teg Holding Inc. served on 11/29/2019, answer due 12/20/2019. (Kreinces, Leonard)
December 4, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by New Son Yeng Produce NY LLC. Amandeep Singh served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (Kreinces, Leonard)
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to A&S Vegetable Inc., Guru Teg Holding Inc., Krishna Holding Inc., OM Vegetable Inc., Sunil Patel, Amandeep Singh. (Ortiz, Grisel)
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by New Son Yeng Produce NY LLC (Kreinces, Leonard)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by New Son Yeng Produce NY LLC (Attachments: #1 Supplement) (Kreinces, Leonard)
November 13, 2019 Proposed summons is rejected. The caption of the summons does not match the caption on the complaint, specifically if you use "et al" you must attach a rider with the full caption. The Clerk's Office cannot issue a summons with an incorrect caption. Counsel is advised to submit a completed proposed summons using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Rodin, Deanna)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
November 13, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by New Son Yeng Produce NY LLC (Kreinces, Leonard)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by New Son Yeng Produce NY LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet and rider) (Kreinces, Leonard)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12058302 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by New Son Yeng Produce NY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- invoices, #2 Exhibit B-invoices, #3 Exhibit C-invoices, #4 Exhibit D-invoices) (Kreinces, Leonard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New Son Yeng Produce NY LLC v. Guru Teg Holding Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Son Yeng Produce NY LLC
Represented By: Leonard Kreinces
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OM Vegetable Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guru Teg Holding Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amandeep Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krishna Holding Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunil Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A&S Vegetable Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?