Wu v. Le Labo Holdings LLC
Plaintiff: Kathy Wu
Defendant: Le Labo Holding LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv06538
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joanna Seybert
Referring Judge: A Kathleen Tomlinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear by Telephone and Request To Schedule Initial Pretrial Conference in related matters for January 27, 2020 by Le Labo Holding LLC. (Kenefick, Matthew)
January 10, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12241643. by Le Labo Holding LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Matthew S. Kenefick in support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Proposed Order) (Kenefick, Matthew)
January 10, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Le Labo Holding LLC identifying Corporate Parent Estee Lauder Companies, Inc. for Le Labo Holding LLC. (Kenefick, Matthew)
January 10, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Le Labo Holding LLC. (Kenefick, Matthew)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting in part and denying in part #6 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Defendant's counsel is advised that while the Court, in certain instances, conducts discovery conferences by telephone, it does not conduct initial conferences by telephone. Defendant's counsel may have local counsel appear at the Initial Conference. If that option is pursued, Defendant's counsel may appear at the Initial Conference by telephone. Defendant's counsel must notify the Court of his intention to appear telephonically by January 20, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 1/3/2020. (Ameri, Mana)
December 31, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear by Telephone by Le Labo Holding LLC. (Kenefick, Matthew)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for January 27, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson in Courtroom 910 at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York. No later than two business days before the Initial Conference, counsel for the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the court's ECF system, a Joint Proposed Discovery Plan. SEE ATTACHED ORDER for additional details.Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 12/16/2019. (Degennaro, Christopher)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Le Labo Holding LLC. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
November 19, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Le Labo Holdings LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12079554 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Kathy Wu. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Le Labo Holdings LLC) (Solotoff, Darryn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wu v. Le Labo Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Wu
Represented By: Darryn G. Solotoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Le Labo Holding LLC
Represented By: Matthew S. Kenefick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?