Stevens v. Trendle
Plaintiff: James Truman Stevens, Jr.
Defendant: Verdell Trendle
Case Number: 2:2019cv06587
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: Pamela K Chen
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 8 Letter dated November 27, 2019 from Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court addressed to the Warden or Superintendent regarding James Truman Stevens, Jr., pro-se notation: "A copy of the Warden's letter was mailed out on November 27, 2019." (Love, Alexis)
December 4, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: A Memorandum and Order of the Honorable Pamela K. Chen, United States District Judge, having been filed on December 3, 2019, dismissing Plaintiff's complaint for failure to state a claim, See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B); certifying pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal would not be taken in good faith; and denying in forma pauperis status for the purpose of any appeal, Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 44445 (1962); it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim, See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B); that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), any appeal would not be taken in good faith; and that in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of any appeal. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 44445 (1962). Signed by Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court by Jalitza Poveda, Deputy Clerk on 12/4/2019. (Love, Alexis)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: For the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum and Order, Plaintiff's complaint, filed in forma pauperis, is dismissed for failure to state a claim. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of any appeal. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to enter judgment and close this case. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 12/3/2019. (Brodziak, Maya)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Pro Se Dept. to James Truman Stevens, Jr. dated November 26, 2019 acknowledging receipt to the civil action. (Cubano, Jazmin)
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Cox, Dwayne)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Authorization (Cox, Dwayne)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Truman Stevens, Jr. (Cox, Dwayne)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Verdell Trendle Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by James Truman Stevens, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cox, Dwayne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevens v. Trendle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verdell Trendle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Truman Stevens, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?