Killoran et al v. Westhampton Beach School District et al
Plaintiff: Terrie Killoran and Christian Killoran
Defendant: Suzanne M. Mensch, Halsey C. Stevens, George R. Kast, Jr., James Hulme, Joyce L. Donneson, Westhampton Beach School District and Michael Radday
Case Number: 2:2019cv06663
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Steven I Locke
Referring Judge: Joanna Seybert
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Related Cases: 17-cv-866-JS-SIL, 17-cv-3553-ADS-SIL, 18-cv-3389-JS-SIL, 19-cv-2418-JS-SIL, 19-cv-3298-JS-SIL, 19-cv-5078-JS-SIL and 20-cv-269-JS-SIL (Cox, Dwayne)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #6 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. The Court finds that a pre-motion conference is unnecessary and GRANTS Defendants leave to move to dismiss the complaint. Defendants shall serve and file their motion on or before February 7, 2020. Plaintiff shall serve and file his opposition on or before March 9, 2020. Defendants shall serve and file their reply, if any, on or before March 24, 2020. In response to the parties' request that the Court administratively redact certain paragraphs of the Complaint, which contains the name and medical diagnosis of a minor, the Clerk of the Court is directed to restrict access to the Complaint (D.E. 1) to case participants only. No future filings shall contain the names of minor children. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2. Defendants are directed to mail a copy of this Electronic Order to the pro se Plaintiff and file proof of service to ECF on or before January 10, 2020. Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 1/7/2020. (Brown, Melissa)
December 23, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER dated 12/20/2019 from Christian Killoran to Judge Seybert re In response to the defendant's "letter to the Court", dated 12/20/2019. (Coleman, Laurie)
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for pre motion conference in anticipation of Motion to Dismiss, and seeking redaction of Para 173 of Complaint, by Joyce L. Donneson, George R. Kast, Jr, Suzanne M. Mensch, Michael Radday, Halsey C. Stevens, Westhampton Beach School District. (Kreppein, Scott)
December 16, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Re: SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christian Killoran. Joyce L. Donneson served on 12/3/2019, answer due 12/24/2019; James Hulme served on 12/3/2019, answer due 12/24/2019; George R. Kast, Jr served on 12/3/2019, answer due 12/24/2019; Suzanne M. Mensch served on 12/3/2019, answer due 12/24/2019; Michael Radday served on 12/3/2019, answer due 12/24/2019; Halsey C. Stevens served on 12/3/2019, answer due 12/24/2019; Westhampton Beach School District served on 12/3/2019, answer due 12/24/2019. (Valle, Christine)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from J. Grady to Pro Se Litigant dated 11/27/2019 Re: THIS LETTER ACKNOWLEDGES RECEIPT OF YOUR CIVIL ACTION(S). DOCKET NUMBER(S) AND JUDGE(S) HAVE BEEN ASSIGNED AS INDICATED ABOVE. (Valle, Christine)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Related Cases: 19-cv-5078-JS-SIL, 19-cv-3298-JS-SIL, 19-cv-2418-JS-SIL, 18-cv-3389-JS-SIL and 17-cv-866-JS-SIL (Cox, Dwayne)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Cox, Dwayne)
November 26, 2019 FILING FEE: $ 400.00, receipt number 28893 (Cox, Dwayne)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Terrie Killoran, Christian Killoran, Christian Killoran(on behalf of his son, Aiden Killoran). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P-1, #2 Exhibit P-2, #3 Exhibit P-3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cox, Dwayne) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/26/2019) (Cox, Dwayne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Killoran et al v. Westhampton Beach School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne M. Mensch
Represented By: Scott J. Kreppein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halsey C. Stevens
Represented By: Scott J. Kreppein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George R. Kast, Jr.
Represented By: Scott J. Kreppein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Hulme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce L. Donneson
Represented By: Scott J. Kreppein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westhampton Beach School District
Represented By: Scott J. Kreppein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Radday
Represented By: Scott J. Kreppein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrie Killoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Killoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?