Dalene et al v. Analar Corporation
Plaintiff: Frank Dalene and Gwen Dalene
Defendant: Analar Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv07035
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denis R Hurley
Referring Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER re #8 : The February 5, 2020 initial conference is adjourned to March 11, 2020 at 1:50 p.m. On or before March 9, 2020, the parties are directed to submit a proposed schedule for the completion of all discovery. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 2/3/2020. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
January 31, 2020 Filing 8 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference on consent by Analar Corporation. (Huang, Jennifer)
January 7, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Analar Corporation. (Massamillo, Eugene)
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Analar Corporation. (Massamillo, Eugene)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Initial Conference ORDER: If counsel cannot agree to the proposed schedule or minor modifications thereof, as attached, they are directed to appear before the undersigned in Courtroom 810, United States Federal Courthouse, Central Islip, New York at the date and time provided in the initial conference order. See attachments for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 12/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order) c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORD received from Judith Pascale, Suffolk County Clerk, Index No. 622421/19. Since the above mentioned case is E-filed, there are no hard copies of the documents listed on the Civil Court Minutes Report. (Cubano, Jazmin)
December 16, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
December 16, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
December 16, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
December 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Analar Corporation from New York Supreme Court, County of Suffolk, case number 622421/2019. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYEDC-12160868) Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Summons & Complaint), #2 Civil Cover Sheet with Rule 7.1 Statement Incorporated) (Huang, Jennifer) Modified on 12/16/2019 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dalene et al v. Analar Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Dalene
Represented By: Lee Jeffrey Mendelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwen Dalene
Represented By: Lee Jeffrey Mendelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Analar Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer Huang
Represented By: Eugene Frank Massamillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?