Dark Arts Consulting, Inc. v. Contravir Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et. al.
Plaintiff: DARK ARTS CONSULTING, INC.
Defendant: HEPION PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHN CAVAN, CONTRAVIR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. and ROBERT FOSTER
Case Number: 2:2019cv07098
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Steven I Locke
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Filing 9 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Selection of Mediator by John Cavan, Contravir Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Robert Foster, Hepion Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Friedman, Robert)
January 27, 2020 MEDIATION INSTRUCTIONS for Counsel are available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Counsel are to select a mediator, schedule the first mediation session, and file the name of the mediator, date, time and place of the first mediation session via CM/ECF using the event Selection of Mediator. For a list of the EDNY Mediators and their qualifications, see the Court's website at https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr/Mediation/displayAll.cfm. EDNY Mediators are compensated in accordance with EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.8(f)(1)[formerly EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.11(f)(1)]. The Confidentiality Stipulation must be signed at the mediation session by all participants, including the mediator, and sent via email to Robyn_Weinstein@nyed.uscourts.gov. The Confidentiality Stipulation is available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be e-mailed to nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov within two weeks following mediation session. (Priftakis, Tina)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation shall be completed by 3/15/2020Selection of Mediator due by 2/5/2020. Mediation can be held in the Brooklyn Courthouse. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 1/27/2020. (Posillico, Lauren)
January 24, 2020 Filing 8 Letter to Judge Azrack re Mediation by John Cavan, Contravir Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Robert Foster, Hepion Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Friedman, Robert)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #5 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. A pre-motion conference will be held on 1/21/2020 at 3:00 PM before Judge Azrack in Courtroom 6E of the Brooklyn Courthouse. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 1/13/2020. (Posillico, Lauren)
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference for leave to file Motion to Dismiss filed by Dark Arts Consulting, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Kapoor, Ashish)
December 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashish Kapoor on behalf of Dark Arts Consulting, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Kapoor, Ashish)
December 26, 2019 Filing 5 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference for leave to file Motion to Dismiss by John Cavan, Contravir Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Robert Foster, Hepion Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Friedman, Robert)
December 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly McCullough on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (McCullough, Kelly)
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
December 18, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JOHN CAVAN, CONTRAVIR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., ROBERT FOSTER, HEPION PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. from New York State Supreme Court, Nassau County, case number 615076/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-12171761) Was the Disclosure Statement completed on the Civil Cover Sheet? - Yes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Friedman, Robert) Modified on 12/19/2019 (Vanderbilt, Evelyn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dark Arts Consulting, Inc. v. Contravir Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARK ARTS CONSULTING, INC.
Represented By: Ashish Kapoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEPION PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: Robert S. Friedman
Represented By: Kelly McCullough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN CAVAN
Represented By: Robert S. Friedman
Represented By: Kelly McCullough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONTRAVIR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: Robert S. Friedman
Represented By: Kelly McCullough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT FOSTER
Represented By: Robert S. Friedman
Represented By: Kelly McCullough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?