JTH Tax, Inc. v. Cole et. al.
Plaintiff: JTH Tax, Inc. d/b/a Liberty Tax Service and JTH Tax, Inc.
Defendant: Michelle Cole, MCAT of Nassau County LLC d/b/a MC Accounting and Tax Services and MCAT of Nassau LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00180
Filed: January 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Anne Y Shields
Nature of Suit: Contract:Franchise
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2020 Filing 14 Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge Joan M. Azrack: CIVIL CAUSE FOR TRO HEARING. Counsel For Plaintiff: Peter Siachos. Pro Se Defendant: Michelle Wilson f/k/a Michelle Cole. Motion Hearing held on 2/25/2020 at 1:00 PM. The parties have reached a resolution of this matter and agree to the following conditions as set forth on the record: Michelle Wilson, formerly known as Michelle Cole, agrees not to operate a competing tax preparation business within 22 miles of her former Liberty Tax location until July 1, 2021. Liberty agrees that the current locations of 405 RXR Plaza, 562 Ash Court, and 686 Jerusalem Avenue, all in Uniondale, NY, are satisfactory and in compliance with the restrictions in the Franchise Agreement. Ms. Wilson agrees not to use Liberty's Operation Manual or confidential and proprietary information. Ms. Wilson will remove the mention of Liberty Tax from the Yelp entry online. The phone numbers have already been relinquished and disconnected. The nonmonetary claims are hereby dismissed with prejudice. The claim of fines allegedly owed is dismissed without prejudice, to be dealt with, if at all, at a later date. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail a copy of this to the pro se defendant at 562 Ash Court, Uniondale, NY, 11553, and mark this case closed. (Civil Case Terminated.)(FTR Log #1:45 2:05, 2:48 2:50.)(Ortiz, Grisel)(c/m) Modified on 2/26/2020 (Ortiz, Grisel).
February 24, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Order of the Court served on Michelle Cole on February 22, 2020, filed by JTH Tax, Inc.. (Siachos, Peter)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: A conference concerning plaintiff's motion for a Temporary Restraining Order (ECF No. #12 ) is scheduled for Tuesday, February 25, 2020 at 1:00 pm in Courtroom 6E North of the Brooklyn Courthouse, located at 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, NY, 11201. Plaintiff is directed to serve its motion papers and this Order on the defendants by 2/22/2020 via overnight mail, and, to the extent possible, via email, and file proof of service on the docket. Defendants are not required to submit anything in writing in advance of the conference, but should be prepared to show cause why a temporary restraining order should not be entered. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 2/21/2020. (Gallagher, Erin)
February 20, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by JTH Tax, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Proposed Order) (Siachos, Peter)
February 14, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Docket Text Order served on Michelle Cole on 02/13/2020, filed by JTH Tax, Inc.. (Siachos, Peter)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Michelle Cole answer due 3/12/2020. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to serve a copy of this Order on Defendant Cole, and to file proof of service on the docket sheet, by February 14, 2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 2/12/2020. (Minerva, Deanna)
February 10, 2020 Filing 10 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Michelle Cole. (Tirado, Chelsea)
January 27, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JTH Tax, Inc.. Michelle Cole served on 1/22/2020, answer due 2/12/2020. (Siachos, Peter)
January 14, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to MCAT of Nassau LLC. (Ortiz, Grisel)
January 14, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Michelle Cole. (Ortiz, Grisel)
January 13, 2020 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. by JTH Tax, Inc. (Siachos, Peter)
January 13, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. by JTH Tax, Inc. (Siachos, Peter)
January 13, 2020 Proposed summons is rejected; the form that is on the Court's website is to be utilized; Counsel is advised to submit another proposed summons using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Ortiz, Grisel)
January 10, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. by JTH Tax, Inc. (Siachos, Peter)
January 10, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
January 10, 2020 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
January 9, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
January 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michelle Cole, MCAT of Nassau County LLC d/b/a MC Accounting and Tax Services filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12236282 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by JTH Tax, Inc. d/b/a Liberty Tax Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (Siachos, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JTH Tax, Inc. v. Cole et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCAT of Nassau County LLC d/b/a MC Accounting and Tax Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCAT of Nassau LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JTH Tax, Inc. d/b/a Liberty Tax Service
Represented By: Peter G. Siachos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JTH Tax, Inc.
Represented By: Peter G. Siachos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?