Pizzabov, Inc. et. al. v. Visa International Service Association et. al.
Plaintiff: 1SaleADay, Octagon Commerce, LLC, East New York Kosler, Corp., YGSL Holdings, LLC, Shnoopcom, Corp. dba Blingdaily.com, US Airmotive Worldwide Corp. dba US Airmotive GSE, Max Binik 2'L Corp. dba KRM Supermarket, M&M Chow, LLC dba Kosher Central, Seven Mile Food Market, LLC, Oh Nuts Of Monsey, Pizzabov, Inc., Therapy Depot, Inc., Glasses Unlimited, Heartland Kosher Products, Inc., Shnoop.com, Corp., Aventura Kosher Kingdom, Inc., CSSY, Farm Fresh Of Lakewood, Inc., Glatt Western Kosher, Inc., Kol Tuv Grocery, Inc., Kollel Food, Inc., LKWD Restaurant, LLC, Oh Nuts, Inc., Mountain Kosher Food Corp., Shnoop.com, LLC, 1Sale, Hollandale Farmers Market, LLC, Ben's Outlet, Breadberry, Inc., Shnoop, LLC, Moishas Kosher Discount Supermarket, Shadora, Shnoopcom, Corp. dba Pennywise.biz, Online Express Manufacturers, Renegade Furniture Group, Inc., Shnoopcom, Corp., Max Binik 2'L Corp., M&M Chow, LLC and US Airmotive Worldwide Corp.
Defendant: Capital One Bank, (USA), N.A., Bank of America Corp., Visa International Service Assocation, Chase Paymentech Solutions, LLC, First National Bank of Omaha, HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., Barclays Bank Delaware, National City Corp., Barclays Financial Corp., JPMorgan Chase & Co., HSBC Finance Corp., Wells Fargo & Company, Chase Bank USA, N.A., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Citibank (South Dakota), N.A., HSBC Holdings, PLC, Citibank N.A., Chase Manhattan Bank USA, N.A., Fifth Third Bancorp, Bank Of America, N.A., Visa U.S.A., Inc., HSBC Bank, PLC, BA Merchant Services LLC, Visa, Inc., Capital One Financial Corporation, National City Bank of Kentucky, Citicorp, Citigroup, Inc., Barclays Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., Capital One F.S.B., Suntrust Banks, Inc., Texas Independent Bancshares, Inc., Suntrust Bank, Visa International Service Association and HSBC North American Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01517
Filed: March 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Referring Judge: James Orenstein
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:25
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER terminating (186) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:05-cv-03800-MKB-JO; terminating (192) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:05-cv-03924-MKB-JO; terminating (187) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:05-cv-03925-MKB-JO; terminating (181) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:05-cv-04131-MKB-JO; terminating (209) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:05-cv-04194-MKB-JO; terminating (248) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:05-cv-04521-MKB-JO; terminating (249) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:05-cv-04520-MKB-JO; terminating (232) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:05-cv-04650-MKB-JO; terminating (168) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:05-cv-04677-MKB-JO; terminating (222) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:05-cv-04728-MKB-JO; terminating (233) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:05-cv-04799-MKB-JO; terminating (175) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:05-cv-04974-MKB-JO; terminating (197) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:05-cv-05077-MKB-JO; terminating (216) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:05-cv-05075-MKB-JO; terminating (222) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:05-cv-05073-MKB-JO; terminating (199) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:05-cv-05071-MKB-JO; terminating (199) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:05-cv-05069-MKB-JO; terminating (198) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:05-cv-05081-MKB-JO; terminating (201) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:05-cv-05083-MKB-JO; terminating (198) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:05-cv-05082-MKB-JO; terminating (202) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:05-cv-05080-MKB-JO; terminating (193) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:05-cv-05078-MKB-JO; terminating (201) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:05-cv-05076-MKB-JO; terminating (198) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:05-cv-05074-MKB-JO; terminating (200) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:05-cv-05070-MKB-JO; terminating (196) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:05-cv-05072-MKB-JO; terminating (177) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:05-cv-05153-MKB-JO; terminating (244) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:05-cv-05207-MKB-JO; terminating (238) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:05-cv-05319-MKB-JO; terminating (181) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:05-cv-05352-MKB-JO; terminating (195) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:05-cv-05866-MKB-JO; terminating (133) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:05-cv-05885-MKB-JO; terminating (134) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:05-cv-05883-MKB-JO; terminating (133) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:05-cv-05881-MKB-JO; terminating (123) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:05-cv-05869-MKB-JO; terminating (129) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:05-cv-05871-MKB-JO; terminating (128) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:05-cv-05879-MKB-JO; terminating (129) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:05-cv-05880-MKB-JO; terminating (131) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:05-cv-05870-MKB-JO; terminating (135) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:05-cv-05868-MKB-JO; temporarily denying (133) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:05-cv-05884-MKB-JO; terminating (133) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:05-cv-05882-MKB-JO; terminating (126) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:05-cv-05878-MKB-JO; terminating (132) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:06-cv-00039-MKB-JO; terminating (86) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:06-cv-00078-MKB-JO; terminating (86) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:06-cv-01829-MKB-JO; terminating (86) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:06-cv-01830-MKB-JO; terminating (86) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:06-cv-01831-MKB-JO; terminating (86) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:06-cv-01832-MKB-JO; terminating (92) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:06-cv-02532-MKB-JO; terminating (75) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:06-cv-05583-MKB-JO; terminating (87) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:06-cv-05765-MKB-JO; terminating (85) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:07-cv-00592-MKB-JO; terminating (66) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:09-cv-02264-MKB-JO; terminating (66) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:09-cv-03225-MKB-JO; terminating (60) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:13-cv-05352-MKB-JO; terminating (151) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:13-cv-05745-MKB-JO; terminating (165) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:13-cv-05746-MKB-JO; terminating (57) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:14-cv-00261-MKB-JO; terminating (54) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:14-cv-06450-MKB-JO; terminating (55) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:16-cv-05507-MKB-JO; terminating (61) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:17-cv-04362-MKB-JO; terminating (120) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:17-cv-04555-MKB-JO; terminating (38) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:18-cv-04568-MKB-JO; terminating (16) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:19-cv-04256-MKB-JO; terminating (68) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:19-cv-04616-MKB-JO; terminating (12) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:19-cv-05567-MKB-JO; terminating (9) Motion for Leave to File in case 2:19-cv-05882-MKB-JO; terminating (27) Motion for Leave to File in case 1:19-cv-06555-MKB-JO. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-JO et al. See Judge Brodie's Order dated December 17, 2019 in MDL 05-1720 finding the motion moot. (Almonte, Kelly)
March 31, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to BA Merchant Services LLC, Bank of America Corp., Bank of America, N.A., Barclays Bank Delaware, Barclays Bank PLC, Capital One Bank, (USA), N.A., Capital One F.S.B., Capital One Financial Corporation, Chase Bank USA, N.A., Chase Paymentech Solutions, LLC, Citibank (South Dakota), N.A., Citibank N.A., Citicorp, Citigroup, Inc., Fifth Third Bancorp, First National Bank of Omaha, HSBC Bank, PLC, HSBC Finance Corp., HSBC Holdings, PLC, HSBC North American Holdings, Inc., JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., National City Bank of Kentucky, National City Corp., Suntrust Bank, Suntrust Banks, Inc., Texas Independent Bancshares, Inc., Visa International Service Association, Visa U.S.A., Inc., Visa, Inc., Wells Fargo & Company. (Piper, Francine)
March 30, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint,,,, by 1Sale, 1SaleADay, Aventura Kosher Kingdom, Inc., Ben's Outlet, Breadberry, Inc., CSSY, East New York Kosler, Corp., Farm Fresh of Lakewood, Inc., Glasses Unlimited, Glatt Western Kosher, Inc., Heartland Kosher Products, Inc., Hollandale Farmers Market, LLC, Kol Tuv Grocery, Inc., Kollel Food, Inc., LKWD Restaurant, LLC, M&M Chow, LLC, Max Binik 2'L Corp., Moishas Kosher Discount Supermarket, Mountain Kosher Food Corp., Octagon Commerce, LLC, Oh Nuts of Monsey, Oh Nuts, Inc., Online Express Manufacturers, Pizzabov, Inc., Renegade Furniture Group, Inc., Seven Mile Food Market, LLC, Shadora, Shnoop, LLC, Shnoop.com, Corp., Shnoop.com, LLC, Shnoopcom, Corp., Shnoopcom, Corp., Therapy Depot, Inc., US Airmotive Worldwide Corp., YGSL Holdings, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Rider To Summons) (Schlanger, Daniel)
March 24, 2020 Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein added. (Marziliano, August)
March 24, 2020 Incorrect Case/Document Entry Information. Deleted all Defendants and re-entered Defendants to conform to the Complaint. Deleted Document Entry No. 1 (Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet) and re-entered as against all Defendants. (Flanagan, Doreen)
March 23, 2020 FILING FEE: $ 400.00, receipt number ANYEDC-12576220 (Flanagan, Doreen)
March 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Shadora, 1SaleADay, LKWD Restaurant, LLC, Mountain Kosher Food Corp., Renegade Furniture Group, Inc., Shnoop.com, Corp., Shnoop, LLC, Kol Tuv Grocery, Inc., Farm Fresh of Lakewood, Inc., Glatt Western Kosher, Inc., 1Sale, Ben's Outlet, Heartland Kosher Products, Inc., East New York Kosler, Corp., Seven Mile Food Market, LLC, Shnoopcom, Corp., Aventura Kosher Kingdom, Inc., M&M Chow, LLC, Shnoop.com, LLC, Pizzabov, Inc., Octagon Commerce, LLC, Online Express Manufacturers, Kollel Food, Inc., Shnoopcom, Corp., Oh Nuts of Monsey, Therapy Depot, Inc., Oh Nuts, Inc., Breadberry, Inc., Max Binik 2'L Corp., CSSY, US Airmotive Worldwide Corp., Moishas Kosher Discount Supermarket, YGSL Holdings, LLC, Glasses Unlimited, Hollandale Farmers Market, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet (Including Attachment Listing All Plaintiffs and Defendants)) (Flanagan, Doreen) Modified on 3/24/2020 (Flanagan, Doreen).
March 23, 2020 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Bowens, Priscilla) Modified on 3/24/2020 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/24/2020: #1 Additional Quality Control Check Sheet) (Flanagan, Doreen).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pizzabov, Inc. et. al. v. Visa International Service Association et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank, (USA), N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visa International Service Assocation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Paymentech Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First National Bank of Omaha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC North America Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Bank Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National City Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Financial Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Finance Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank USA, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank (South Dakota), N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Holdings, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Manhattan Bank USA, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Third Bancorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank Of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visa U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BA Merchant Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visa, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National City Bank of Kentucky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citicorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Bank PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One F.S.B.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suntrust Banks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Independent Bancshares, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suntrust Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visa International Service Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC North American Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1SaleADay
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schlanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Octagon Commerce, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schlanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: East New York Kosler, Corp.
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schlanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YGSL Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schlanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shnoopcom, Corp. dba Blingdaily.com
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schlanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US Airmotive Worldwide Corp. dba US Airmotive GSE
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schlanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Max Binik 2'L Corp. dba KRM Supermarket
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schlanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M&M Chow, LLC dba Kosher Central
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schlanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seven Mile Food Market, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schlanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oh Nuts Of Monsey
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schlanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pizzabov, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schlanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Therapy Depot, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schlanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glasses Unlimited
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schlanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heartland Kosher Products, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schlanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shnoop.com, Corp.
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schlanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aventura Kosher Kingdom, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schlanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CSSY
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schlanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farm Fresh Of Lakewood, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schlanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glatt Western Kosher, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schlanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kol Tuv Grocery, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schlanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kollel Food, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schlanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LKWD Restaurant, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schlanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oh Nuts, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schlanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mountain Kosher Food Corp.
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schlanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shnoop.com, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schlanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1Sale
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schlanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hollandale Farmers Market, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schlanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ben's Outlet
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schlanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Breadberry, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schlanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shnoop, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schlanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moishas Kosher Discount Supermarket
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schlanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shadora
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schlanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shnoopcom, Corp. dba Pennywise.biz
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schlanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Online Express Manufacturers
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schlanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renegade Furniture Group, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schlanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shnoopcom, Corp.
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schlanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Max Binik 2'L Corp.
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schlanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M&M Chow, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schlanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US Airmotive Worldwide Corp.
Represented By: Daniel Adam Schlanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?