Marzigliano v. Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation
Plaintiff: Denise Marzigliano
Defendant: Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation
Case Number: 2:2020cv01539
Filed: March 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Central Islip Office
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Steven Tiscione
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2020 Filing 13 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Cox, Dwayne)
March 25, 2020 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:20-cv-01150. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 24, 2020 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Eastern District of New York. (jwh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/25/2020.]
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Plaintiff is a resident of the Eastern District of New York (Suffolk County) and it was in defendant's store in that District (Suffolk County) in which the incident, a slip and fall, occurred. Plaintiff appears to be a citizen of Florida. Nothing is alleged to have occurred in this District. Both parties agree that the action should be transferred to the Eastern District of New York. The Clerk is directed to transfer the action to the Eastern District of New York for the convenience of parties and witnesses and in the interests of justice. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 3/24/2020) (jwh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/25/2020.]
March 23, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #8 Order to Show Cause,. Document filed by Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation..(Greystone, Jonathan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/25/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 9 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Law Office of Neil Moldovan PC dated March 20, 2020 re: Court's Order to Show Cause. Document filed by Denise Marzigliano. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Response to Order to Show Cause, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A).(Moldovan, Neil) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/25/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Let the parties show cause within 21 days why this action ought not be (a) remanded to Supreme Court, State of New York from which it was removed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction; or (b) if not remanded, then dismissed for improper venue, or alternatively transferred to the Eastern District of New York for the convenience of parties and witnesses and in the interests of justice. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 3/3/2020) (jwh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/25/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation served on 2/6/2010, answer due 4/7/2010. Service was accepted by Secretary of State- Amy Leseh. Document filed by Denise Marzigliano..(Moldovan, Neil) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/25/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Denise Marzigliano.(Moldovan, Neil) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/25/2020.]
February 17, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation..(Greystone, Jonathan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/25/2020.]
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/14/2020 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 2/12/2020) (cf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/25/2020.]
February 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 150410/2020..Document filed by Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Greystone, Jonathan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/25/2020.]
February 11, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jonathan Justin Greystone. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/25/2020.]
February 11, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jonathan Justin Greystone to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): As per ECF filing rule 13.3, Each attachment must be clearly titled in the ECF entry so the subject of the exhibit is clear; Exhibits should not be filed in the same PDF as the Notice of Removal. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. **DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS** (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/25/2020.]
February 11, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jonathan Justin Greystone. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/25/2020.]
February 11, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/25/2020.]
February 11, 2020 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/25/2020.]
February 11, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/25/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Greystone, Jonathan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/25/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 150410/2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18748998).Document filed by Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation..(Greystone, Jonathan) Modified on 2/11/2020 (pne). [Transferred from New York Southern on 3/25/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marzigliano v. Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Marzigliano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation
Represented By: Jonathan Justin Greystone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?