Jacoff v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Andrew F. Jacoff
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2020cv01662
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary R Brown
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank D. Tankard on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (aty to be noticed) (Tankard, Frank)
April 20, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew F. Jacoff. (Osborn, Daniel)
April 20, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew F. Jacoff. (Osborn, Daniel)
April 20, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew F. Jacoff. Commissioner of Social Security served on 4/20/2020, answer due 5/11/2020. (Osborn, Daniel)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Administrative Record to be filed within 60 days of the date that this Order is docketed. Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings to be filed within 45 days from the filing of the administrative record. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) SO Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 4/6/2020. (Tirado, Chelsea)
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons-U.S. Attorney, #2 Summons-U.S. Attorney General) (Flanagan, Doreen)
April 2, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
April 2, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
April 2, 2020 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12624466 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Andrew F. Jacoff. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Commissioner of Social Security, #3 Proposed Summons Commissioner of Social Security c/o U.S. Attorney General, #4 Proposed Summons Commissioner of Social Security c/o U.S. Attorney) (Osborn, Daniel) Modified on 4/2/2020 (Flanagan, Doreen).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacoff v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew F. Jacoff
Represented By: Daniel Adam Osborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION - GENERIC
Represented By: Frank D. Tankard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?