IPA Asset Management, LLC v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association
Plaintiff: IPA Asset Management, LLC
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association
Case Number: 2:2020cv01684
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Referring Judge: Steven I Locke
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2020 Filing 7 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference to set a deadline for IPA to file its motion to remand by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. (Parker, Scott)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendant's request #5 for a pre-motion conference on an anticipated motion to dismiss and a reply letter from Plaintiff #6 which includes a request for leave to file a motion for remand. Plaintiff's request to file a motion for remand is GRANTED. Plaintiff's motion for remand shall be respectfully REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Locke for a report and recommendation. Defendant's request #5 for a pre-motion conference is DENIED with leave to renew pending the outcome of the motion to remand. Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 4/22/2020. (Williams, Erica)
April 21, 2020 Filing 6 Letter Response to Defendant's Letter Motion by IPA Asset Management, LLC (Callegari, Dominick)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: Plaintiff's request, made with consent of Defendant, for an extension until April 23, 2020 to file a response to Defendant's request for a PMC is GRANTED in part. Defendant shall file a response letter by April 21, 2020. Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 4/20/2020. (Williams, Erica)
April 17, 2020 Filing 5 Letter Requesting Extension with attached Stipulation to Adjourn by IPA Asset Management, LLC (Callegari, Dominick)
April 9, 2020 Filing 4 Letter requesting a pre-motion conference by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association (Parker, Scott)
April 3, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
April 3, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
April 3, 2020 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Suffolk, Case Number 603337/2020 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-12627912). Was the Disclosure Statement on the Civil Cover Sheet completed - Yes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Affirmation of Service, #3 Exhibit C Notice of Appearance, #4 Exhibit D Request for Certificate of Service, #5 Exhibit E JPMorgan Chase Articles of Association, #6 Exhibit F Administrative Order, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Certificate of Service) (Parker, Scott) Modified on 4/3/2020 (Flanagan, Doreen).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IPA Asset Management, LLC v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association
Represented By: Scott W. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IPA Asset Management, LLC
Represented By: Dominick James Callegari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?