The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company v. American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Plaintiff: The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01974
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sandra J Feuerstein
Referring Judge: Steven I Locke
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER: The initial conference scheduled for 9/10/20 is converted to a telephone conference and is ADVANCED to 7/8/20 at 11:00 a.m. At that time, the parties are directed to call the teleconferencing number (877) 336-1280 and follow the automated instructions. The access code is 7215690. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 6/16/2020. (Disbrow, Sandra)
June 15, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Great American Insurance Company for American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (McKenna, John)
June 15, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (McKenna, John)
June 5, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company served on 5/26/2020, answer due 6/16/2020. (Potashner, Marshall)
May 1, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company re Scheduling Order,, (Potashner, Marshall)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 9/10/2020 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein at the Central Islip Courthouse, located at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York 11722. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. Plaintiff(s) shall serve a copy of this Order upon defendant(s) and file proof of such service with the Court. c/ECF.Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 5/1/2020. (Disbrow, Sandra)
April 30, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Rodin, Deanna)
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
April 30, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company (Potashner, Marshall)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12737006 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Potashner, Marshall)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company v. American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Marshall T. Potashner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Represented By: John D McKenna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?