Government Employees Insurance Company et. al. v. Lyons Medical, P.C. et. al.
Plaintiff: GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company and Government Employees Insurance Company
Defendant: Instar Medical, P.C., John Sherry Lyons, M.D., Anthony Degradi, John Doe Defendants 1-10, Lyons Medical, P.C., Allied Management Group, LLC, JAVS Ventures, Inc., Eric Feldmann, M.D. and Jeffrey Byrne
Case Number: 2:2020cv02089
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denis R Hurley
Referring Judge: Steven I Locke
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER re: DE #18 . The deadline for Jeffrey Byrne and Allied Management Group, LLC to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to and including 8/5/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 7/5/2020. (Goudreault, Jessica)
July 2, 2020 Filing 18 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,,, STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANTS JEFFREY BYRNE AND ALLIED MANAGEMENT GROUP, LLC TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Allied Management Group, LLC, Jeffrey Byrne (Pearlson, A.)
July 2, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by A. Ross Pearlson on behalf of Allied Management Group, LLC, Jeffrey Byrne (aty to be noticed) (Pearlson, A.)
July 2, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Falk Wernick on behalf of Allied Management Group, LLC, Jeffrey Byrne (aty to be noticed) (Wernick, Melissa)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER granting DE #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. On consent, the deadline for John Sherry Lyons, MD and Lyons Medical, P.C. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended nunc pro tunc to 7/23/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 6/26/2020. (Goudreault, Jessica)
June 25, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by John Sherry Lyons, MD, Lyons Medical, P.C.. (Campese, Maria)
June 19, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria Campese on behalf of John Sherry Lyons, MD, Lyons Medical, P.C. (aty to be noticed) (Campese, Maria)
June 19, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Conroy on behalf of John Sherry Lyons, MD, Lyons Medical, P.C. (aty to be noticed) (Conroy, Matthew)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER granting DE #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. On consent, the deadline for Instar Medical, P.C. and Eric Feldman, M.D. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to and including 7/8/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 6/9/2020. (Goudreault, Jessica)
June 8, 2020 Filing 12 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by Eric Feldmann, MD, Instar Medical, P.C.. (Harfenist, Steven)
June 8, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. Anthony Degradi served on 5/18/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. (Sirignano, Michael)
June 8, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. John Sherry Lyons, MD served on 5/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020. (Sirignano, Michael)
June 8, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. Jeffrey Byrne served on 5/20/2020, answer due 6/10/2020. (Sirignano, Michael)
June 8, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. Instar Medical, P.C. served on 5/18/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. (Sirignano, Michael)
June 8, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. Lyons Medical, P.C. served on 5/18/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. (Sirignano, Michael)
May 26, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J. Harfenist on behalf of Eric Feldmann, MD, Instar Medical, P.C. (aty to be noticed) (Harfenist, Steven)
May 7, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Allied Management Group, LLC, Jeffrey Byrne, Anthony Degradi, Eric Feldmann, M.D., Instar Medical, P.C., JAVS Ventures, Inc., John Sherry Lyons, M.D., Lyons Medical, P.C.. (Flanagan, Doreen)
May 7, 2020 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
May 7, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Corporate Parent GEICO Corporation for GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Sirignano, Michael)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allied Management Group, LLC, Jeffrey Byrne, Anthony Degradi, Eric Feldmann, M.D., Instar Medical, P.C., JAVS Ventures, Inc., John Doe Defendants 1-10, John Sherry Lyons, M.D., Lyons Medical, P.C. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12767683 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed - Yes,, filed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons and Rider, #3 Exhibit 1 - Fraudulent Claims Identified To-Date - Lyons Medical, P.C., #4 Exhibit 2 - Fraudulent Claims Identified To-Date - Instar Medical, P.C., #5 Exhibit 3 - Relevant DOI Opinion Letters) (Sirignano, Michael) Modified on 5/7/2020 (Flanagan, Doreen).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Government Employees Insurance Company et. al. v. Lyons Medical, P.C. et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Instar Medical, P.C.
Represented By: Steven J. Harfenist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Sherry Lyons, M.D.
Represented By: Maria Campese
Represented By: Matthew J. Conroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Degradi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Defendants 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyons Medical, P.C.
Represented By: Maria Campese
Represented By: Matthew J. Conroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Management Group, LLC
Represented By: Melissa Falk Wernick
Represented By: A. Ross Pearlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAVS Ventures, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Feldmann, M.D.
Represented By: Steven J. Harfenist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Byrne
Represented By: Melissa Falk Wernick
Represented By: A. Ross Pearlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO Indemnity Company
Represented By: Michael A. Sirignano
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Represented By: Ryan C Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO Casualty Company
Represented By: Michael A. Sirignano
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Represented By: Ryan C Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael A. Sirignano
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Represented By: Ryan C Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael A. Sirignano
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Represented By: Ryan C Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?