Consolidated Aircraft Supply Co., Inc. v. Indeed, Inc. et. al.
Plaintiff: Consolidated Aircraft Supply Co., Inc.
Defendant: John Does 1 - 5 and Indeed, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02299
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary R Brown
Referring Judge: Steven Tiscione
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 10:00 a.m. on October 20, 2020 before the undersigned in Courtroom 710 of the Central Islip Courthouse located at 100 Federal Plaza. Counsel for all parties must attend. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than October 16th. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 6/16/2020. (Vasquez, Lea)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Indeed, Inc. answer due 10/13/2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 6/16/2020. (Vasquez, Lea)
June 15, 2020 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Consolidated Aircraft Supply Co., Inc.. (Zabell, Saul)
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Consolidated Aircraft Supply Co., Inc.. Indeed, Inc. served on 6/3/2020, answer due 6/24/2020. (Zabell, Saul)
May 21, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Indeed, Inc.. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
May 21, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
May 21, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12826532 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Consolidated Aircraft Supply Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Zabell, Saul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Consolidated Aircraft Supply Co., Inc. v. Indeed, Inc. et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 - 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indeed, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Consolidated Aircraft Supply Co., Inc.
Represented By: Ryan M Eden
Represented By: Saul D. Zabell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?