Scarpinella v. Toyota Motor Corporation et. al.
Plaintiff: Kathleen R. Scarpinella
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc. and Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02513
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-13004315. by Kathleen R. Scarpinella. (Attachments: #1 Lee M. Heath Affidavit, #2 SC Certificate of Good Standing) (Heath, Lee)
July 1, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically by Kathleen R. Scarpinella. (Attachments: #1 Filing Fee Receipts) (Dean, Kevin)
July 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin R Dean on behalf of Kathleen R. Scarpinella (notification declined or already on case) (Dean, Kevin)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER re #5 : The Motion of Kevin Dean for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 7/1/2020. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
June 30, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12997179. by Kathleen R. Scarpinella. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Kevin Dean Affidavit, #2 SC Certificate of Good Standing, #3 GA Certificate of Good Standing, #4 MS Certificate of Good Standing) (Dean, Kevin)
June 5, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
June 5, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12888321 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No. filed by Kathleen R. Scarpinella. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons (TEMA), #3 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons (TMA), #4 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons (TMC), #5 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons (TMS)) (Weisinger, Howard) Modified on 6/5/2020 (Vanderbilt, Evelyn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scarpinella v. Toyota Motor Corporation et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen R. Scarpinella
Represented By: Howard D. Weisinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?