Hewitt v. Sprint/United Management Company et. al.
Plaintiff: Patricia Hewitt
Defendant: Sprint/United Management Company, WARRANTY LOGISTICS, LLC, WARRANTY LOGISTICS, LLC as assignee of d/b/a Asurion and Warranty Logistics, LLC doing business as Asurion
Case Number: 2:2020cv02740
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Rachel P Kovner
Referring Judge: Steven I Locke
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER granting DE #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. On consent, the deadline for Sprint/United Management Company to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to and including 8/21/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 7/22/2020. (Scrivani, Hillary)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move Against or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Sprint/United Management Company. (Dobson, Kimberly)
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Natalie Dobson on behalf of Sprint/United Management Company (aty to be noticed) (Dobson, Kimberly)
June 22, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Sprint/United Management Company, Warranty Logistics, LLC. (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 22, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 22, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Rachel P. Kovner and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 22, 2020 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sprint/United Management Company, Warranty Logistics, LLC, filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12952822 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Patricia Hewitt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Barnhorn, David) Modified on 6/22/2020 (Flanagan, Doreen).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hewitt v. Sprint/United Management Company et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint/United Management Company
Represented By: Kimberly Natalie Dobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARRANTY LOGISTICS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARRANTY LOGISTICS, LLC as assignee of d/b/a Asurion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warranty Logistics, LLC doing business as Asurion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Hewitt
Represented By: David Donald Barnhorn
Represented By: Peter Arcadio Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?