Kirschenbaum v. Fensterman et al
Plaintiff: Mark Kirschenbaum and Michigan Lenders, LLC
Defendant: Howard S. Fensterman, Abrams Fensterman, Fensterman, Eisman, Formato, Ferrara, Wolf & Carone, LLP and Patti Piccininni
Case Number: 2:2020cv02934
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joanna Seybert
Referring Judge: Steven Tiscione
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Abrams Fensterman, Fensterman, Eisman, Formato, Ferrara, Wolf & Carone, LLP, Howard S. Fensterman, Patti Piccininni. (Leibson, Alex)
July 13, 2020 Filing 8 First MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically and Exhibits by Mark Kirschenbaum. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Court Receipt for Payment, #2 Exhibit Court Receipt for Payment) (Klein, David)
July 10, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Patti Piccininni. (Valle, Christine)
July 10, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Abrams Fensterman, Fensterman, Eisman, Formato, Ferrara, Wolf & Carone, LLP. (Valle, Christine)
July 10, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Howard S. Fensterman. (Valle, Christine)
July 8, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #2 Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening, #1 Complaint, by Mark Kirschenbaum (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Klein, David)
July 6, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta)
July 6, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta)
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/6/2020: #1 Additional Corrections) (Landow, Concetta).
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number BNYEDC-13009467 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Mark Kirschenbaum, Michigan Lenders, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Klein, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirschenbaum v. Fensterman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard S. Fensterman
Represented By: Alex Leibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abrams Fensterman, Fensterman, Eisman, Formato, Ferrara, Wolf & Carone, LLP
Represented By: Alex Leibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patti Piccininni
Represented By: Alex Leibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Kirschenbaum
Represented By: David J. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michigan Lenders, LLC
Represented By: David J. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?