Nunez v. Noeth
Petitioner: Marvin Siciliano Nunez
Respondent: Joseph Noeth
Case Number: 2:2020cv03034
Filed: July 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kiyo A Matsumoto
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 Mail receipt (Lato, Karla)
August 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: Respondent shall file a complete and entire answer or other pleading in response to the petition, and shall electronically file the State Court record, within sixty (60) days of the date of this order. Petitioner shall file any reply to respondent's answer within thirty (30) days of the filing of the answer. Petitioner may proceed without being required to prepay fees or costs, or give security therefor. The Clerk of Court shall serve copies of this Order and the petition for a writ of habeas corpus by certified mail upon petitioner at his list known address, as well as the Attorney General of the State of New York and the District Attorney for Suffolk County by certified mail, and note service on the docket. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 8/23/2020. (Brasky, Michael)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING ORDER: Respondent shall file a complete and entire answer or other pleading in response to the petition, and shall electronically file the State Court record, within sixty (60) days of the date of this order. Petitioner shall file any reply to respondent's answer within thirty (30) days of the filing of the answer. It is further ordered that petitioner is granted #2 leave to proceed without being required to prepay fees or costs, or give security therefor. Respondent shall serve a copy of this order upon petitioner, and file proof of service with the Clerk of the Court, within ten (10) days of the date of this order. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 7/10/2020. (Brasky, Michael)
July 4, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marvin Siciliano Nunez. (Cox, Dwayne)
July 4, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus , filed by Marvin Siciliano Nunez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cox, Dwayne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nunez v. Noeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joseph Noeth
Represented By: SUFFOLK COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE - GENERIC
Represented By: NEW YORK STATE ATTORNEY GENERALS OFFICE - GENERIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marvin Siciliano Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?