Ortiz v. County Of Nassau et al
Plaintiff: Alexander Ortiz
Defendant: ASSISTANT DISTRICT ATTORNEY VICTORIA MAURI, County Of Nassau, DETECTIVE LUIS SALAZAR (Sh #908), NASSAU UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER and its John Doe and Jane Doe Doctors and SANE Nurses, NASSAU COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY Madeline Singas, and John and Jane Doe Supervisors, NASSAU COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES and its John Doe and Jane Doe Caseworkers, Nassau County Police Department, Madeline Singas, Detective Luis A. Salazar, Victoria Mauri, Nassau University Medical Center and Nassau County Department of Social Services
Case Number: 2:2020cv03469
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: William F Kuntz
Referring Judge: Steven I Locke
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 6 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint (with consent of Plaintiff's counsel) by County Of Nassau, Victoria Mauri, Nassau County Department of Social Services, Nassau County Police Department, Luis A. Salazar, Madeline Singas. (Ben-Sorek, Liora)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 9/23/2020. (Stykes, Jacqueline)
September 4, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to County Of Nassau, Victoria Mauri, Nassau County Department of Social Services, Nassau County Police Department, Nassau University Medical Center, Luis A. Salazar, Madeline Singas. (Layne, Monique)
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. by Alexander Ortiz (Langer, Michael)
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 3, 2020 Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: Did not use the correct Summons form AO 440 Rev 6/12, SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION, Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 3, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against County Of Nassau, Nassau County Police Department, Madeline Singas, Victoria Mauri, Nassau County Department of Social Services, Nassau University Medical Center, Luis Salazar filing fee $400, receipt number ANYEDC-13146729, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes, filed by Alexander Ortiz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Rollock, Donald) Modified on 8/3/2020 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz v. County Of Nassau et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASSISTANT DISTRICT ATTORNEY VICTORIA MAURI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County Of Nassau
Represented By: Liora M. Ben-Sorek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DETECTIVE LUIS SALAZAR (Sh #908)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NASSAU UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER and its John Doe and Jane Doe Doctors and SANE Nurses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NASSAU COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY Madeline Singas, and John and Jane Doe Supervisors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NASSAU COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES and its John Doe and Jane Doe Caseworkers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nassau County Police Department
Represented By: Liora M. Ben-Sorek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madeline Singas
Represented By: Liora M. Ben-Sorek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Luis A. Salazar
Represented By: Liora M. Ben-Sorek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria Mauri
Represented By: Liora M. Ben-Sorek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nassau University Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nassau County Department of Social Services
Represented By: Liora M. Ben-Sorek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Ortiz
Represented By: Donald T. Rollock
Represented By: Michael J. Langer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?