LaBarbera v. Johnson and Johnson
Plaintiff: Philip LaBarbera
Defendant: Johnson and Johnson
Case Number: 2:2020cv03609
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Referring Judge: Joanna Seybert
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Case transferred from New York Eastern has been opened in District of New Jersey [LIVE] as case 3:20-cv-12390, filed 09/08/2020. (Florio, Lisa)
September 3, 2020 Case electronically transferred to District of New Jersey. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Ortiz, Grisel)
September 3, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFIED JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 226) IN RE: JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 2738. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the District of New Jersey for the reasons stated in the order of October 4, 2016, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Freda L. Wolfson. (Ortiz, Grisel)
September 3, 2020 Filing 7 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 226) IN RE: JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 2738. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the District of New Jersey for the reasons stated in the order of October 4, 2016, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Freda L. Wolfson. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. (Ortiz, Grisel)
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RELATED ACTIONS filed before the JPMDL. (Marziliano, August)
August 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE: Pursuant to R.P.J.P.M.L. 4.l(b), please find enclosed the Notice of Related Actions filed by Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., filed with the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation today. (Florio, Lisa)
August 11, 2020 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 11, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 11, 2020 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Defendants on 08/11/2020 by Philip LaBarbera, Individually and as Executor of the Estate of Arlene A. LaBarbera (Deceased). Waiver of Service due by 10/13/2020. (Goldstein, Brian)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Johnson and Johnson filing fee $400, receipt number ANYEDC-13192894, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No, filed by Philip LaBarbera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Goldstein, Brian) Modified on 8/11/2020 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LaBarbera v. Johnson and Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson and Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip LaBarbera
Represented By: Brian A. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?