Minuteman Press v. Glen Cove Post Office
Plaintiff: Minuteman Press
Defendant: Glen Cove Post Office
Case Number: 2:2020cv03761
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary R Brown
Referring Judge: A Kathleen Tomlinson
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Glen Cove Post Office re Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference,,,,, (Dickman, Mary)
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Glen Cove Post Office TO PRO SE LITIGANT OPPOSING MOTION TO DISMISS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Text of Rule 12, #2 Text of Rule 56, #3 Letter to Plaintiff dated September 17, 2020, #4 Certificate of Service) (Dickman, Mary)
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Glen Cove Post Office re #3 MOTION for pre motion conference for proposed motion to dismiss Complaint (Dickman, Mary)
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Glen Cove Post Office re #1 Notice of Removal, and all exhibits (Dickman, Mary)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #3 Motion for Pre Motion Conference.A pre-motion telephone conference is scheduled for October 20, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. before Judge Gary R. Brown, at which time the parties should be prepared to address defendant's anticipated motion pursuant to Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, DE 3. The parties are to call (888) 363-4734 using ACCESS CODE 4132441 five minutes prior to the designated time.The parties are on notice that in appropriate cases, the pre-motion letter and the response, along with the parties' arguments made at the pre-motion conference, may be construed at the discretion of the Court as the motion itself. Arguments not raised in the pre-motion letters or during the pre-motion conference shall be deemed waived. See In re Best Payphones, Inc., 450 F. App'x 8, 15 (2d Cir. 2011).At the conference, the Court will issue a briefing schedule if necessary. Plaintiff is directed to respond to DE 3 in accordance with the undersigned's individual rules by October 5, 2020. Before requesting an adjournment, the parties shall meet and confer and submit a joint letter with several proposed dates. Counsel for defendant is directed to serve a copy of this Order on plaintiff and file proof of service forthwith. Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 9/18/2020. (Meil, Stephen)
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary M. Dickman on behalf of Glen Cove Post Office (notification declined or already on case) (Dickman, Mary)
September 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for pre motion conference for proposed motion to dismiss Complaint by Glen Cove Post Office. (Dickman, Mary)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Cox, Dwayne)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Glen Cove Post Office from State of New York, County of Nassau Glen Cove City Court Commercial Claim Part, case number CC-000003-20/GC. Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cox, Dwayne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Minuteman Press v. Glen Cove Post Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minuteman Press
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen Cove Post Office
Represented By: Diane C. Leonardo-Beckmann
Represented By: Diane C. Leonardo
Represented By: Mary M. Dickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?