Roe v. John Does 1-11
Plaintiff: Mr. Richard Roe
Defendant: John Does 1-11
Case Number: 2:2020cv03788
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Referring Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Plaintiff's motion to proceed under a pseudonym or, in the alternative, to seal the case #2 is hereby denied. Because Rule 10(a) requires Plaintiff to proceed using his real name, he shall file an Amended Complaint so doing by October 21, 2020. Alternatively, he may file a Rule 41 notice of dismissal. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 10/14/2020. (Farrell, Gillian)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara for all further proceedings. Judge Denis R. Hurley, Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 8/24/2020. Motions referred to Sanket J. Bulsara. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta)
August 21, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Motions referred to A. Kathleen Tomlinson. (Landow, Concetta)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/21/2020: #1 Addtional Corrections) (Landow, Concetta).
August 20, 2020 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against John Does 1-11 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Richard Roe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/20/2020) (Bowens, Priscilla).
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of MOTION for Discovery by Richard Roe. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Pre-Service Discovery, #2 Declaration of Mark Seiden, #3 Exhibit A) (Barnes, Douglas)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of MOTION to Seal Case by Richard Roe. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support In Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym) (Barnes, Douglas)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Richard Roe against John Does, 1-11 filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13236409 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Richard Roe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Barnes, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roe v. John Does 1-11
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Richard Roe
Represented By: Douglas Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-11
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?