Gordon v. United States Fire Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Anat Gordon
Defendant: United States Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv03792
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joanna Seybert
Referring Judge: Anne Y Shields
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: United States Fire Insurance Company answer due 10/30/2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 10/5/2020. (Minerva, Deanna)
October 5, 2020 Filing 9 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by United States Fire Insurance Company. (Leventhal, Markham)
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anat Gordon. United States Fire Insurance Company served on 9/9/2020, answer due 9/30/2020. (Hardy, Tiffany)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to United States Fire Insurance Company. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 20, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Anat Gordon (Hardy, Tiffany)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Jon Fishbein on behalf of Anat Gordon (aty to be noticed) (Fishbein, Adam)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany N. Hardy on behalf of Anat Gordon (notification declined or already on case) (Hardy, Tiffany)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Class Action against United States Fire Insurance Company filing fee $400, receipt number ANYEDC-13234787, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes, filed by Anat Gordon. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C, #4 Appendix D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons to Defendant US Fire Insurance) (Hardy, Tiffany) Modified on 8/20/2020 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gordon v. United States Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anat Gordon
Represented By: Tiffany N. Hardy
Represented By: Adam Jon Fishbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Markham Leventhal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?