Darden v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Plaintiff: Barbara Darden
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Case Number: 2:2020cv03809
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary R Brown
Referring Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Gray on behalf of Barbara Darden (notification declined or already on case) (Gray, John)
October 1, 2020 ATTN: John E. Gray - If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Tirado, Chelsea)
September 18, 2020 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Barbara Darden (Gray, John)
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Gray on behalf of Barbara Darden (notification declined or already on case) (Gray, John)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Gary R. Brown for all further proceedings. Judge Denis R. Hurley no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 8/24/2020. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta)
August 21, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/21/2020: #1 Additional Corrections) (Landow, Concetta).
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (O'Connor, Joseph)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (O'Connor, Joseph)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP identifying Other Affiliate Walmart Inc., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart De Mexico, Other Affiliate SEIYU for Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (O'Connor, Joseph)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP from Supreme Court, Queens County, case number 709620/2019. Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-13240128) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Summons and Complaint and Verified Answer, #2 Exhibit B-CPLR 3017 Demand, #3 Exhibit C-Response to 3017 Demand, #4 Affidavit of Mailing) (O'Connor, Joseph) Modified on 8/21/2020 (Landow, Concetta).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Darden v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Joseph O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Darden
Represented By: John E. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?