Bartha v. Island Auto Buyers LTD
Plaintiff: Joseph Bartha
Defendant: Island Auto Buyers LTD
Case Number: 2:2020cv04338
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary R Brown
Referring Judge: Anne Y Shields
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2020 REQUEST for Certificate of Default #7 is denied at this time. The affirmation in support of the #7 Request for Certificate of Default does not demonstrate, as required by Local Civil Rule 55.1(b), that the defendant was properly served. (Toritto, Jim)
October 27, 2020 Filing 7 Request for Certificate of Default by Joseph Bartha (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affirmation in support, #2 Proposed Certificate of Default) (Kasell, David)
October 7, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Bartha. Island Auto Buyers LTD served on 9/25/2020, answer due 10/16/2020. (Kasell, David)
September 17, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Island Auto Buyers LTD, filed by Joseph Bartha. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. "A" Advertisement, #2 Exhibit Ex. "B" RISC, #3 Exhibit Ex. "C" Recipts for downpayments) (Kasell, David)
September 17, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Island Auto Buyers LTD. (Landow, Concetta)
September 17, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta)
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Landow, Concetta)
September 17, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta)
September 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Island Auto Buyers LTD filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13370857 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Joseph Bartha. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Receipts for downpayment, #2 Exhibit "B" RISC, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons) (Kasell, David) Modified on 9/17/2020 (Landow, Concetta).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bartha v. Island Auto Buyers LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Bartha
Represented By: David Michael Kasell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Island Auto Buyers LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?