Dukes et al v. Cold Spring Harbor Central School District Board of Education et al
Plaintiff: S.D., Donna M. Dukes, Gordon Dukes and D.D.
Defendant: Cold Spring Harbor Central School District Board of Education, Dr. Betty Rosa, CSHCSD McKinney-Vento and Eleanor Fuller
Case Number: 2:2020cv04532
Filed: September 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Steven Tiscione
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Filing 16 Letter To Hon. Joan M. Azrack re Stay Request by CSHCSD McKinney-Vento, Cold Spring Harbor Central School District Board of Education, Eleanor Fuller (Novitz, Rondiene)
October 20, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for letter to Judge Azrack served on Plaintiffs on 10/20/20, filed by Betty Rosa. (Pack, Lori)
October 20, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affirmation in opposition to request for TRO served on Plaintiffs on 10/20/20, filed by Betty Rosa. (Pack, Lori)
October 20, 2020 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Order to Show Cause filed by CSHCSD McKinney-Vento, Cold Spring Harbor Central School District Board of Education, Eleanor Fuller. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Novitz, Rondiene)
October 20, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition to Order to Show Cause by CSHCSD McKinney-Vento, Cold Spring Harbor Central School District Board of Education, Eleanor Fuller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Novitz, Rondiene)
October 20, 2020 Filing 11 Letter To Hon. Joan M. Azrack by CSHCSD McKinney-Vento, Cold Spring Harbor Central School District Board of Education, Eleanor Fuller (Novitz, Rondiene)
October 19, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #3 Unsigned Order to Show Cause by Betty Rosa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A mail envelope, #2 Exhibit Ex B Justice Walsh decision, #3 Exhibit Ex C pending OSC in 3rd. Dept., #4 Exhibit Ex D AG opp to OCS in 3rd. Dept.) (Pack, Lori)
October 19, 2020 Filing 9 Letter regarding order to show cause by Betty Rosa (Pack, Lori)
October 19, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Rondiene Erin Novitz on behalf of Cold Spring Harbor Central School District Board of Education (aty to be noticed) (Novitz, Rondiene)
October 19, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lori L. Pack on behalf of Betty Rosa (aty to be noticed) (Pack, Lori)
October 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura A. Ferrugiari on behalf of Cold Spring Harbor Central School District Board of Education (aty to be noticed) (Ferrugiari, Laura)
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 Letter from Pro Se Office to Pro Se Litigant dated 9/30/2020 Re: This letter acknowledges receipt of your civil action(s). (Ortiz, Grisel)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: 1) Plaintiffs' motion to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is granted. 2) Due to the COVID-19 pandemic, the requirement of service by the United States Marshal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c) is suspended by Administrative Order 2020-19-1. Because of the time-sensitive nature of Plaintiffs' request, Plaintiffs are directed to serve a copy of the Complaint and this Order on Defendants. The Pro Se Office is directed to contact Plaintiffs and instruct them to do so. 3) Within fourteen (14) days of the date of service, Defendants are ordered to show cause before this Court, by the filing of a response, why a temporary restraining order or preliminary injunction should not be issued enjoining Defendants from excluding S.D. from Cold Spring Harbor Central School District and access to both in person and virtual instruction and transportation. Defendants shall serve a copy of the response on Plaintiffs. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 9/25/2020. (Walsh, Catherine).
September 24, 2020 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta)
September 23, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Order to Show Cause and Temporary Restraining Order by D.D., Donna M. Dukes, Gordon Dukes, S.D. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support) (Landow, Concetta) Modified on 9/24/2020 (Landow, Concetta).
September 23, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by D.D., Donna M. Dukes, Gordon Dukes, S.D.. (Landow, Concetta)
September 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by D.D., Gordon Dukes, Donna M. Dukes, S.D.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Landow, Concetta)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dukes et al v. Cold Spring Harbor Central School District Board of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cold Spring Harbor Central School District Board of Education
Represented By: Laura A. Ferrugiari
Represented By: Rondiene Erin Novitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Betty Rosa
Represented By: Lori L. Pack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSHCSD McKinney-Vento
Represented By: Rondiene Erin Novitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eleanor Fuller
Represented By: Rondiene Erin Novitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna M. Dukes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gordon Dukes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?