Bonner v. Long Island Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Joseph Bonner
Defendant: Long Island Railroad Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv04561
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sandra J Feuerstein
Referring Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Long Island Railroad Company. (McCaffrey, Kevin)
October 23, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Long Island Railroad Company identifying Corporate Parent Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Other Affiliate Metro North Commuter Railroad Company, Other Affiliate New York City Transit Authority, Other Affiliate Staten Island Railway/Staten Island Rapid Transit Operating Authority, Other Affiliate MTA Capital Construction, Other Affiliate MTA Bus Company for Long Island Railroad Company. (McCaffrey, Kevin)
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Long Island Railroad Company. (Cubano, Jazmin)
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. Re #4 Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet, Quality Control Check - Summons, by Joseph Bonner (Wietzke, Marc)
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. Re Quality Control Check - Summons, by Joseph Bonner (Wietzke, Marc)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 12/9/2020 10:30 AM before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. Said conference will be conducted telephonically. At the designated time, the Parties are to call Chambers' teleconferencing number, (877) 336-1280 , and follow the automated instructions; the access code is: 7215690 . Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order upon defendant and file proof of such service with the Court. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 9/28/2020. c/ECF (Adell, April)
September 28, 2020 Proposed summons is rejected; edits cannot be made to the document; the Clerk's Office cannot issue the summons. Counsel is advised to submit another proposed summons that is in a fillable PDF format. Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Rodin, Deanna)
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
September 28, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Long Island Railroad Company filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13421578 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Joseph Bonner. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wietzke, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonner v. Long Island Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Bonner
Represented By: Marc Wietzke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Island Railroad Company
Represented By: Kevin Patrick McCaffrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?