Sehgal et al v. Aggarwal et al
Plaintiff: East Northport Fast Food LLC, Massapequa Fast Food LLC, Sanjay Sehgal, Huntington Fast Food LLC and Levittown Fast Food LLC
Defendant: Raman Aggarwal and Meriam Enterprise LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv04577
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Referring Judge: Joanna Seybert
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Electronic NOTICE of Hearing: Due to counsel's scheduling conflict, the Pre-Motion Conference is now set for Fri. 12/11/2020 at 2:15pm by phone before Judge Joanna Seybert. Parties should dial 1 (877) 336-1839 and enter access code 7231185# at the prompt. If you receive any message denying/delaying entry, hang up and call back. (Baran, Charles)
November 19, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaspreet S. Mayall on behalf of Raman Aggarwal, Meriam Enterprise LLC (aty to be noticed) (Mayall, Jaspreet)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Pre-Motion Conference. Pre-Motion Conference set for Thu. 12/10/2020 at 10:00am by phone before Judge Joanna Seybert. Parties should dial 1 (877) 336-1839 and enter access code 7231185# at the prompt. If you receive any message denying/delaying entry, hang up and call back. Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 11/18/2020. (Baran, Charles)
November 11, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION for pre motion conference re #1 Complaint, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bowman, Michele)
November 4, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Leigh Milone on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Milone, Nicole)
November 4, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for pre motion conference re #1 Complaint, by Raman Aggarwal, Meriam Enterprise LLC. (Gionis, John)
November 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John H. Gionis on behalf of Raman Aggarwal, Meriam Enterprise LLC (aty to be noticed) (Gionis, John)
November 4, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sanjay Sehgal, East Northport Fast Food LLC, Huntington Fast Food LLC, Massapequa Fast Food LLC, Levittown Fast Food LLC. Meriam Enterprise LLC served on 10/22/2020, answer due 11/12/2020. (Bowman, Michele)
October 26, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sanjay Sehgal, East Northport Fast Food LLC, Huntington Fast Food LLC, Massapequa Fast Food LLC, Levittown Fast Food LLC. Raman Aggarwal served on 10/21/2020, answer due 11/11/2020. (Bowman, Michele)
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Raman Aggarwal, Meriam Enterprise LLC. (Rodin, Deanna)
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
September 28, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by East Northport Fast Food LLC, Huntington Fast Food LLC, Levittown Fast Food LLC, Massapequa Fast Food LLC, Sanjay Sehgal (Bowman, Michele)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by East Northport Fast Food LLC, Huntington Fast Food LLC, Levittown Fast Food LLC, Massapequa Fast Food LLC, Sanjay Sehgal (Bowman, Michele)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13424316 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Sanjay Sehgal, East Northport Fast Food LLC, Huntington Fast Food LLC, Massapequa Fast Food LLC, Levittown Fast Food LLC. (Bowman, Michele)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sehgal et al v. Aggarwal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: East Northport Fast Food LLC
Represented By: Michele Marie Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Massapequa Fast Food LLC
Represented By: Michele Marie Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sanjay Sehgal
Represented By: Michele Marie Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huntington Fast Food LLC
Represented By: Michele Marie Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levittown Fast Food LLC
Represented By: Michele Marie Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raman Aggarwal
Represented By: John H. Gionis
Represented By: Jaspreet S. Mayall
Represented By: Nicole Leigh Milone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meriam Enterprise LLC
Represented By: John H. Gionis
Represented By: Jaspreet S. Mayall
Represented By: Nicole Leigh Milone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?