Ditullio v. H&L Contracting, LLC et al
Plaintiff: John Ditullio
Defendant: Village Dock, Inc., H&L Contracting, LLC and Village Dock Contracting, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv04858
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sandra J Feuerstein
Referring Judge: Steven Tiscione
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 688
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by James Edward Mercante on behalf of H&L Contracting, LLC, Village Dock Contracting, Inc., Village Dock, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Mercante, James)
November 19, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by H&L Contracting, LLC, Village Dock Contracting, Inc., Village Dock, Inc.. (Stern, Michael)
November 17, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by H&L Contracting, LLC, Village Dock Contracting, Inc., Village Dock, Inc.. (Stern, Michael)
October 30, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Ditullio. Village Dock, Inc. served on 10/21/2020, answer due 11/11/2020. (Schweitzer, Timothy)
October 30, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Ditullio. Village Dock Contracting, Inc. served on 10/21/2020, answer due 11/11/2020. (Schweitzer, Timothy)
October 30, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Ditullio. H&L Contracting, LLC served on 10/21/2020, answer due 11/11/2020. (Schweitzer, Timothy)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 1/26/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein. Said conference will be conducted telephonically. At that time, the Parties are to call Chambers' teleconferencing number, (877) 336-1280, and follow the automated instructions; the access code is: 7215690. FURTHER: The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. Plaintiff(s) shall serve a copy of this SCHEDULING ORDER upon Defendant(s) and file proof of such service with the Court. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 10/14/2020. c/ECF (Killigrew, Patricia)
October 13, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to H&L Contracting, LLC, Village Dock Contracting, Inc., Village Dock, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Village Dock, Inc., #2 Summons Village Dock Contracting, Inc.) (Rodin, Deanna)
October 13, 2020 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 13, 2020 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 13, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against H&L Contracting, LLC, Village Dock Contracting, Inc., Village Dock, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13498470 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by John Ditullio. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons) (Schweitzer, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ditullio v. H&L Contracting, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village Dock, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Evan Stern
Represented By: James Edward Mercante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H&L Contracting, LLC
Represented By: Michael Evan Stern
Represented By: James Edward Mercante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village Dock Contracting, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Evan Stern
Represented By: James Edward Mercante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Ditullio
Represented By: Timothy F. Schweitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?