Berger v. McCrosson et. al.
Plaintiff: Paul Berger
Defendant: Eric Rosenfeld, Terry Stinson, Harvey J. Bazaar, CPI Aerostructures, Inc., Janet K. Cooper, Douglas McCrosson, Carey E. Bond, Vincent Palazzolo and Walter Paulick
Case Number: 2:2020cv05454
Filed: November 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Referring Judge: Eric N Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Cassandra Mitchell on behalf of Harvey J. Bazaar, Carey E. Bond, CPI Aerostructures, Inc., Janet K. Cooper, Douglas McCrosson, Vincent Palazzolo, Walter Paulick, Eric Rosenfeld, Terry Stinson (aty to be noticed) (Mitchell, Cassandra)
January 7, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Bridge on behalf of Harvey J. Bazaar, Carey E. Bond, CPI Aerostructures, Inc., Janet K. Cooper, Douglas McCrosson, Vincent Palazzolo, Walter Paulick, Eric Rosenfeld, Terry Stinson (aty to be noticed) (Bridge, Charles)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak for all further proceedings (as related to 20-cv-982). Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein, Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 11/30/2020. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 13, 2020 Filing 10 Letter re: Relatedness by Harvey J. Bazaar, Carey E. Bond, CPI Aerostructures, Inc., Janet K. Cooper, Douglas McCrosson, Vincent Palazzolo, Walter Paulick, Eric Rosenfeld, Terry Stinson (Bongiorno, Michael)
November 13, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Flanagan, Doreen)
November 13, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates that Case No. 1:20-cv-02092 (ENV)(CLP) is a related case. (Flanagan, Doreen)
November 13, 2020 Filing 7 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
November 13, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
November 12, 2020 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Davis, Kimberly) Modified on 11/13/2020 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/13/2020: #1 Additional Quality Control Check Sheet) (Flanagan, Doreen).
November 10, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CPI Aerostructures, Inc. (Bongiorno, Michael)
November 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Tamar Batya Kaplan-Marans on behalf of Harvey J. Bazaar, Carey E. Bond, CPI Aerostructures, Inc., Janet K. Cooper, Douglas McCrosson, Vincent Palazzolo, Walter Paulick, Eric Rosenfeld, Terry Stinson (aty to be noticed) (Kaplan-Marans, Tamar)
November 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael G. Bongiorno on behalf of Harvey J. Bazaar, Carey E. Bond, CPI Aerostructures, Inc., Janet K. Cooper, Douglas McCrosson, Vincent Palazzolo, Walter Paulick, Eric Rosenfeld, Terry Stinson (notification declined or already on case) (Bongiorno, Michael)
November 10, 2020 Filing 2 Joint MOTION to Seal by Harvey J. Bazaar, Carey E. Bond, CPI Aerostructures, Inc., Janet K. Cooper, Douglas McCrosson, Vincent Palazzolo, Walter Paulick, Eric Rosenfeld, Terry Stinson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration In Support, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B) (Bongiorno, Michael)
November 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13662533 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Paul Berger. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Keller, Beth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berger v. McCrosson et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Rosenfeld
Represented By: Michael G. Bongiorno
Represented By: Tamar Batya Kaplan-Marans
Represented By: Cassandra Mitchell
Represented By: Charles Bridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Stinson
Represented By: Michael G. Bongiorno
Represented By: Tamar Batya Kaplan-Marans
Represented By: Cassandra Mitchell
Represented By: Charles Bridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvey J. Bazaar
Represented By: Michael G. Bongiorno
Represented By: Tamar Batya Kaplan-Marans
Represented By: Cassandra Mitchell
Represented By: Charles Bridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPI Aerostructures, Inc.
Represented By: Michael G. Bongiorno
Represented By: Tamar Batya Kaplan-Marans
Represented By: Cassandra Mitchell
Represented By: Charles Bridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet K. Cooper
Represented By: Michael G. Bongiorno
Represented By: Tamar Batya Kaplan-Marans
Represented By: Cassandra Mitchell
Represented By: Charles Bridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas McCrosson
Represented By: Michael G. Bongiorno
Represented By: Tamar Batya Kaplan-Marans
Represented By: Cassandra Mitchell
Represented By: Charles Bridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carey E. Bond
Represented By: Michael G. Bongiorno
Represented By: Tamar Batya Kaplan-Marans
Represented By: Cassandra Mitchell
Represented By: Charles Bridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Palazzolo
Represented By: Michael G. Bongiorno
Represented By: Tamar Batya Kaplan-Marans
Represented By: Cassandra Mitchell
Represented By: Charles Bridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Paulick
Represented By: Michael G. Bongiorno
Represented By: Tamar Batya Kaplan-Marans
Represented By: Cassandra Mitchell
Represented By: Charles Bridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Berger
Represented By: Beth A. Keller
Represented By: Laurence Paskowitz
Represented By: Juan Eneas Monteverde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?