Home Team 668 LLC v. Town Of East Hampton et al
Plaintiff: Home Team 668 LLC
Defendant: Town Of East Hampton, Ann Glennon, Linda Scicolone, Thomas Talmage and Michael Sendlenski
Case Number: 2:2020cv05828
Filed: December 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Steven I Locke
Referring Judge: Joanna Seybert
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Pre Motion Conference by Ann Glennon, Linda Scicolone, Michael Sendlenski, Town Of East Hampton. (Gross, Felicia) Modified type of hearing on 1/29/2021 (Florio, Lisa).
January 5, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Felicia Gross on behalf of Michael Sendlenski (aty to be noticed) (Gross, Felicia)
December 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Felicia Gross on behalf of Town Of East Hampton (aty to be noticed) (Gross, Felicia)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER re #6 Notice(Other) filed by Home Team 668 LLC. The Clerk of the Court shall record Plaintiff's Counsel's name as "Richard L. Ravin" on the docket. Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 12/4/2020. (Brown, Melissa)
December 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Home Team 668 LLC Notice of Change (Ravin, Richard)
December 3, 2020 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
December 3, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
December 3, 2020 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
December 3, 2020 Incorrect Document Entry Information. Complaint was filed as against plaintiff. Entry was deleted and refiled as against defendants. (Rodin, Deanna)
December 2, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet. Re #1 Complaint by Home Team 668 LLC (Ravin, Richard) (Main Document 3 replaced for statistical reasons on 12/3/2020) (Florio, Lisa).
December 2, 2020 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Page 2 of the Civil Cover Sheet is missing. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Landow, Concetta)
December 2, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Home Team 668 LLC (Ravin, Richard)
December 1, 2020 FILING FEE: $402, receipt number ANYEDC-13768007 (Rodin, Deanna)
December 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes, filed by Home Team 668 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A Preliminary Site Plan Application, #3 Exhibit B Planning Board Site Plan Approval, #4 Exhibit C Building Permit, #5 Exhibit D Zoning Board of Appeals, by James A. Coon, #6 Exhibit E Envelope enclosing Stop Work Order, #7 Exhibit F Appearance Ticket, Misdemeanor Information Counts 1 and 2, #8 Exhibit G Home Team Appeal to ZBA, #9 Exhibit H Planning Board Approval of Amended Site Plan, #10 Exhibit I Thiele Email to Ravin Denying Dismissal of Criminal Complaints, #11 Exhibit J Home Team Notice of Claim to East Hampton, #12 Exhibit K Superseding Misdemeanor Information Counts 1 and 2, #13 Exhibit L Article 78 Petition and Complaint with Exhibits B, D, F and K, #14 Exhibit M Signed TRO and Order to Show Cause, Article 78 Action, #15 Exhibit N Zoning Board of Appeals Determination, #16 Exhibit O East Hampton Town Code 255-6-50(f), #17 Exhibit P Photos of 87 S. Euclid (before and after switchback ramp), #18 Exhibit Q Photo of 88 S. Euclid, #19 Exhibit R Photo of East Hampton concrete ramp) (Rodin, Deanna) Modified on 12/3/2020 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Home Team 668 LLC v. Town Of East Hampton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town Of East Hampton
Represented By: Felicia Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Glennon
Represented By: Felicia Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Scicolone
Represented By: Felicia Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Talmage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sendlenski
Represented By: Felicia Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Home Team 668 LLC
Represented By: Richard Leib Ravin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?