Tawfik v. Georgatos et al
Plaintiff: Salah H. Tawfik
Defendant: Premier Diner, Arche Georgatos and Peter Georgatos
Case Number: 2:2020cv05832
Filed: November 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joanna Seybert
Referring Judge: A Kathleen Tomlinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION of Service of Electronic Order by Arche Georgatos, Peter Georgatos, Premier Diner (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter enclosing Electronic Order) (Zabell, Saul)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER re #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. By Order dated December 8, 2020, the Court denied Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis and directed Plaintiff to pay the filing fee within fourteen (14) days. (Order, ECF No. 5.) To date, Plaintiff has not paid the filing fee nor has he otherwise communicated with the Court. In an abundance of caution and given his pro se status, the Court grants Plaintiff one final opportunity to comply with the December 8, 2020 Order. Accordingly, Plaintiff is directed to remit the $400.00 filing fee within fourteen (14) days after his receipt of this Electronic Order. The Court warns Plaintiff that a failure to timely comply with this Electronic Order will lead to the dismissal of the Complaint without prejudice and judgment will enter. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of any appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Defendants are directed to mail a copy of this Electronic Order to the pro se Plaintiff at his address of record and file proof of service to the docket on or before January 22, 2021. Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 1/19/2021. (Brown, Melissa)
December 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Marie McManus on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (McManus, Diana)
December 22, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Saul D. Zabell on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Zabell, Saul)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; For the reasons that follow, the application to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED and Plaintiff is directed to remit the filing fee within fourteen (14) days after his receipt of this Order. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of any appeal. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this Order to the pro se Plaintiff at his address of record. So Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 12/8/2020. (Valle, Christine)
December 2, 2020 Filing 4 Letter from Pro Se Office to Pro Se Litigant dated 12/2/2020 Re: RECEIPT OF CIVIL ACTION(S). (Valle, Christine)
December 2, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Cox, Dwayne)
November 30, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Salah H. Tawfik. (Cox, Dwayne)
November 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Salah H. Tawfik. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cox, Dwayne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tawfik v. Georgatos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Diner
Represented By: Diana Marie McManus
Represented By: Saul D. Zabell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arche Georgatos
Represented By: Diana Marie McManus
Represented By: Saul D. Zabell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Georgatos
Represented By: Diana Marie McManus
Represented By: Saul D. Zabell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salah H. Tawfik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?