The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development v. Toscano et al
Plaintiff: The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development, an agency of the United States of America and The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development
Defendant: Annette Krauss, New York State Department of Taxation and Finance, Clerk of the Suffolk County Traffic & Parking Violations Agency, Capital One Bank USA NA, Mary Michels, Christine Toscano, Joseph Toscano, JOHN DOE #1-5 and JANE DOE #1-5, People of the State of New York o/b/o Clerk of the Suffolk County District Court and People of the State of New York
Case Number: 2:2020cv05998
Filed: December 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denis R Hurley
Referring Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12:1703
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2021 Filing 31 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT: It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Joseph Toscano has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Joseph Toscano is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Toritto, Jim)
February 3, 2021 Filing 30 DECLARATION re #29 Request for Certificate of Default by The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development (Manfredi, John)
February 3, 2021 Filing 29 Request for Certificate of Default by The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development (Manfredi, John)
February 2, 2021 Filing 28 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT: It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Christine Toscano has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Christine Toscano is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Toritto, Jim)
February 1, 2021 Filing 27 DECLARATION re #26 Request for Certificate of Default by The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development (Manfredi, John)
February 1, 2021 Filing 26 Request for Certificate of Default by The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development (Manfredi, John)
January 28, 2021 Filing 25 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT: It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Capital One Bank USA NA has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Capital One Bank USA NA is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Toritto, Jim)
January 25, 2021 Filing 24 DECLARATION re #23 Request for Certificate of Default by The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development (Manfredi, John)
January 25, 2021 Filing 23 Request for Certificate of Default by The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development (Manfredi, John)
January 25, 2021 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development. Annette Krauss served on 1/18/2021, answer due 2/8/2021. (Manfredi, John)
January 21, 2021 Filing 21 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT: It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant People of the State of New York has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant People of the State of New York is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Toritto, Jim)
January 20, 2021 Filing 20 DECLARATION re #19 Request for Certificate of Default by The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development (Manfredi, John)
January 20, 2021 Filing 19 Request for Certificate of Default by The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development (Manfredi, John)
January 20, 2021 Filing 18 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT: It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Clerk of the Suffolk County Traffic & Parking Violations Agency has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Clerk of the Suffolk County Traffic & Parking Violations Agency is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Toritto, Jim)
January 19, 2021 Filing 17 DECLARATION re #16 Request for Certificate of Default by The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development (Manfredi, John)
January 19, 2021 Filing 16 Request for Certificate of Default by The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development (Manfredi, John)
January 19, 2021 Filing 15 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT: It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant New York State Department of Taxation and Finance has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant New York State Department of Taxation and Finance is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Toritto, Jim)
January 19, 2021 Filing 14 DECLARATION re #13 Request for Certificate of Default by The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development (Manfredi, John)
January 19, 2021 Filing 13 Request for Certificate of Default by The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development (Manfredi, John)
January 7, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development. Capital One Bank USA NA served on 12/30/2020, answer due 1/20/2021. (Manfredi, John)
January 5, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development. New York State Department of Taxation and Finance served on 12/22/2020, answer due 1/12/2021. (Manfredi, John)
January 4, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development. Joseph Toscano served on 12/22/2020, answer due 1/12/2021. (Manfredi, John)
January 4, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development. Christine Toscano served on 12/22/2020, answer due 1/12/2021. (Manfredi, John)
January 4, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development. People of the State of New York served on 12/22/2020, answer due 1/12/2021. (Manfredi, John)
January 4, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development. Clerk of the Suffolk County Traffic & Parking Violations Agency served on 12/22/2020, answer due 1/12/2021. (Manfredi, John)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein recused. Case reassigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley for all further proceedings.Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 12/11/2020. (Morabito, Bryan)
December 10, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Capital One Bank USA NA, Clerk of the Suffolk County Traffic & Parking Violations Agency, Annette Krauss, Mary Michels, New York State Department of Taxation and Finance, People of the State of New York, Christine Toscano, Joseph Toscano. (Rodin, Deanna)
December 10, 2020 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
December 10, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
December 10, 2020 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
December 9, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint,, by The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development, an agency of the United States of America (Manfredi, John)
December 9, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint,, by The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development, an agency of the United States of America (Manfredi, John)
December 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Capital One Bank USA NA, Clerk of the Suffolk County Traffic & Parking Violations Agency, JOHN DOE #1-5 and JANE DOE #1-5, Annette Krauss, Mary Michels, New York State Department of Taxation and Finance, People of the State of New York, Christine Toscano, Joseph Toscano Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No, filed by The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Attachments: #1 exhibit a, #2 exhibit b, #3 exhibit c, #4 exhibit d, #5 exhibit e, #6 exhibit f) (Manfredi, John) Modified on 12/10/2020 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development v. Toscano et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annette Krauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Department of Taxation and Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clerk of the Suffolk County Traffic & Parking Violations Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank USA NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Michels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Toscano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Toscano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE #1-5 and JANE DOE #1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: People of the State of New York o/b/o Clerk of the Suffolk County District Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: People of the State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development, an agency of the United States of America
Represented By: John Manfredi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development
Represented By: John Manfredi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?