Sanders v. South Shore Nissan LLC
Plaintiff: Yvette Sanders
Defendant: South Shore Nissan LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00345
Filed: January 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary R Brown
Referring Judge: Anne Y Shields
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION by Yvette Sanders (Kasell, David)
March 1, 2021 Filing 7 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT: It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant South Shore Nissan LLC has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant South Shore Nissan LLC is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Toritto, Jim)
February 25, 2021 Filing 6 Request for Certificate of Default by Yvette Sanders (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Kasell, David)
February 12, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yvette Sanders. South Shore Nissan LLC served on 2/3/2021, answer due 2/24/2021. (Kasell, David)
January 21, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to South Shore Nissan LLC. (Landow, Concetta)
January 21, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta)
January 21, 2021 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Landow, Concetta)
January 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against South Shore Nissan LLC filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14025362 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Yvette Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit"A" Offer from South Shore, #2 Exhibit "B" RISC, #3 Exhibit "C" Warranty Cancellation Requeat, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kasell, David) Modified on 1/21/2021 (Landow, Concetta).
January 21, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders v. South Shore Nissan LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Shore Nissan LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvette Sanders
Represented By: David Michael Kasell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?