Majkrzak et al v. Long Island Auto Mall Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Marian Majkrzak and Joanna Majkrzak
Defendant: Capital One, N.A., Long Island Auto Mall Corp., Island Auto Mall and Capital One Auto Finance
Case Number: 2:2021cv00386
Filed: January 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sandra J Feuerstein
Referring Judge: Steven Tiscione
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1640
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joanna Majkrzak, Marian Majkrzak re Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines,, (Nahoum, Robert)
February 22, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marian Majkrzak, Joanna Majkrzak. Long Island Auto Mall Corp. served on 2/9/2021, answer due 3/2/2021. (Nahoum, Robert)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order An Initial Conference is set for 5/13/2021 at 9:30 AM before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein. At that time, the parties are directed to call the teleconferencing number (877) 336-1280 and follow the automated instructions; the access code is 7215690. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. Plaintiff(s) shall serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file proof of such service with the Court.Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 2/8/2021. (Schiraldi, Patricia)
February 2, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Marian Majkrzak, Joanna Majkrzak. Capital One, N.A. waiver sent on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021. (Nahoum, Robert)
January 25, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons #2) (Landow, Concetta)
January 25, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta)
January 25, 2021 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Landow, Concetta)
January 25, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta)
January 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Marian Majkrzak, Joanna Majkrzak. (Attachments: #1 Summons #1, #2 Summons #2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Landow, Concetta)
January 23, 2021 FILING FEE: $ 402.00, receipt number ANYEDC-14036918 (Landow, Concetta)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Majkrzak et al v. Long Island Auto Mall Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Island Auto Mall Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Island Auto Mall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Auto Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marian Majkrzak
Represented By: Robert J. Nahoum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanna Majkrzak
Represented By: Robert J. Nahoum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?