Wright v. Community Housing Innovations, Inc.
Plaintiff: Deirdre Wright
Defendant: Community Housing Innovations, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00865
Filed: February 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary R Brown
Referring Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Community Housing Innovations, Inc.. (Juffa, Laura)
March 16, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan David Hallett on behalf of Community Housing Innovations, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Hallett, Jonathan)
March 16, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Community Housing Innovations, Inc. (Juffa, Laura)
March 16, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Baldwin Juffa on behalf of Community Housing Innovations, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Juffa, Laura)
March 3, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deirdre Wright. Community Housing Innovations, Inc. served on 2/23/2021, answer due 3/16/2021. (Barnhorn, David)
February 18, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Community Housing Innovations, Inc.. (Flanagan, Doreen)
February 18, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
February 18, 2021 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
February 18, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
February 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Community Housing Innovations, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14161171 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Deirdre Wright. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Barnhorn, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Community Housing Innovations, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Housing Innovations, Inc.
Represented By: Laura Baldwin Juffa
Represented By: Jonathan David Hallett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deirdre Wright
Represented By: David Donald Barnhorn
Represented By: Peter Arcadio Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?